This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2018 at 07:46:14 (UTC).

Blackburn v. Cash Express of Tennessee, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 Blackburn filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cash Express of Tennessee, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory F. VanTatenhove and Edward B. Atkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:18-CV-00110

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory F. VanTatenhove

Referral Judge

Edward B. Atkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerry Renee Blackburn

Defendant

Cash Express of Tennessee, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan D. Brown

Attorney at Ferrell & Brown, PLLC

160 E. Second Ave, Po Box 401

Williamson, WV 25661

Joshua S. Ferrell

160 E. Second Avenue, Suite 401

Williamson, WV 25661

Defendant Attorney

Joseph W. Borchelt

Attorney at Reminger Co. LPA - Cincinnati

525 Vine Street, Suite 1700

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant by Cash Express of Tennessee, LLC. (Borchelt, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY 1. (a) parties stipulate that preliminary disclosures exchanged by Friday, November 16, 2018. (b) all fact discovery by Thursday, August 1, 2019. 2. (b) Pla initial disclosures of expert reports required by Rule 26(a)(2) by Thursday, May 30, 2019. Dft initial disclosures of expert reports required by Rule 26(a)(2) by Sunday, June 30, 2019. rebuttal expert testimony within 30 days. (c) Supp NLT Friday, August 30, 2019. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (a) parties have to Wednesday, May 1, 2019 join additional parties or amend pleadings. (b) parties have to Sunday, September 15, 2019, dispositive motions, Daubert motions, and/or motions in limine. PRETRIAL 1. Final Pretrial Conference Wednesday, October 30, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Frankfort, Ky. 2. NLT Friday, November 1, 2019, counsel shall file with Clerk: a-c. 3. NLT 10 days prior to FPTC, counsel shall file with Clerk: a-e. 4. NLT 10 days after receipt of filing, counsel shall file: a-b. TRIAL Jury Trial on Tuesday, November 12, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Pikeville, Ky, counsel by 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) this matter is referred to Mag. Judge Edward B. Atkins for purpose of: 1. Supervising discovery and pretrial proceedings. 2. Conducting all pretrial and status conferences, establishing and extending discovery deadlines, and all other deadlines and ruling on non-dispositive motions, except motions in limine. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 11/14/2018. (RCB)cc: COR (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Joseph W. Borchelt. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Cash Express of Tennessee, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (RCB) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Brown, Nathan) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#6

(#6) FIRST DISCLOSURES Rule 26(a) by Jerry Renee Blackburn.(Brown, Nathan) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jerry Renee Blackburn First Set of Plaintiff's Discovery Request (Brown, Nathan) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

4 #1

AO 85 form

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING: 1. NLT 30 days from date of entry of this order, parties shall conduct meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). 3. NLT 10 days after meeting, parties shall file a written joint report outlining proposed discovery plan: (a)-(h), (i) whether parties will consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Consent forms are attached and forms signed by all parties' counsel should be filed NLT date counsels' joint status report is due. If parties consent, Clerk shall re-assign this matter to appropriate Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 AO 85 form) (RCB)cc: COR (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Cash Express of Tennessee, LLC. (RCB) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice of Removal to Federal Court

1 #3

Exhibit C - Fax Sent to Attorney Brown

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Docket

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pike Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-994, filed by Cash Express of Tennessee, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4187529) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Fax Sent to Attorney Brown, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(RCB) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant by Cash Express of Tennessee, LLC. (Borchelt, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY 1. (a) parties stipulate that preliminary disclosures exchanged by Friday, November 16, 2018. (b) all fact discovery by Thursday, August 1, 2019. 2. (b) Pla initial disclosures of expert reports required by Rule 26(a)(2) by Thursday, May 30, 2019. Dft initial disclosures of expert reports required by Rule 26(a)(2) by Sunday, June 30, 2019. rebuttal expert testimony within 30 days. (c) Supp NLT Friday, August 30, 2019. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (a) parties have to Wednesday, May 1, 2019 join additional parties or amend pleadings. (b) parties have to Sunday, September 15, 2019, dispositive motions, Daubert motions, and/or motions in limine. PRETRIAL 1. Final Pretrial Conference Wednesday, October 30, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Frankfort, Ky. 2. NLT Friday, November 1, 2019, counsel shall file with Clerk: a-c. 3. NLT 10 days prior to FPTC, counsel shall file with Clerk: a-e. 4. NLT 10 days after receipt of filing, counsel shall file: a-b. TRIAL Jury Trial on Tuesday, November 12, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Pikeville, Ky, counsel by 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) this matter is referred to Mag. Judge Edward B. Atkins for purpose of: 1. Supervising discovery and pretrial proceedings. 2. Conducting all pretrial and status conferences, establishing and extending discovery deadlines, and all other deadlines and ruling on non-dispositive motions, except motions in limine. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 11/14/2018. (RCB)cc: COR (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (RCB) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Joseph W. Borchelt. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Cash Express of Tennessee, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (RCB) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Brown, Nathan) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FIRST DISCLOSURES Rule 26(a) by Jerry Renee Blackburn.(Brown, Nathan) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jerry Renee Blackburn First Set of Plaintiff's Discovery Request (Brown, Nathan) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER FOR REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING: 1. NLT 30 days from date of entry of this order, parties shall conduct meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). 3. NLT 10 days after meeting, parties shall file a written joint report outlining proposed discovery plan: (a)-(h), (i) whether parties will consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Consent forms are attached and forms signed by all parties' counsel should be filed NLT date counsels' joint status report is due. If parties consent, Clerk shall re-assign this matter to appropriate Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 AO 85 form) (RCB)cc: COR (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (RCB) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Cash Express of Tennessee, LLC. (RCB) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pike Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-994, filed by Cash Express of Tennessee, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4187529) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Fax Sent to Attorney Brown, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(RCB) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.