This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2020 at 18:29:05 (UTC).

Blackbird Tech LLC v. Niantic, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2017 Blackbird Tech LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Niantic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-01810

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Blackbird Tech LLC

Blackbird Tech LLC doing business as Blackbird Technologies

Defendant

Niantic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Richard C Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

Two Fox Point Center, 6 Denny Road, Suite 307

Wilmington, DE 19809

Wendy H. Verlander

David A. Gerasimow

Christopher R. Freeman

Jeffrey D. Ahdoot

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

David Ellis Moore

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Darin W. Snyder

Alexander B. Parker

John X. Zhu

Luann L. Simmons

Jianing Liu

Bindu Ann George Palapura

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Bill Trac

 

Court Documents

#57

(#57) ORDER Administratively Closing the case (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2019. (nms) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#56

(#56) SO ORDERED Granting #55 Stipulation and Order to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/16/2019. (nms) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#55

(#55) STIPULATION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review Proceedings by Niantic, Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

54 #2

Exhibit 5-8

54 #1

Exhibit 1-4

#54

(#54) Joint Claim Construction Statement, by Blackbird Tech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4, #2 Exhibits 5-8)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/9/2019 (nms). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#52

(#52) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Clifford Chad Henson by Blackbird Tech LLC (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#51

(#51) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Niantic's Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Niantic, Inc..(Buckley, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#50

(#50) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Blackbird Tech LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#38

(#53) ORAL ORDER re #38 Order Setting Mediation Conferences: The mediation scheduled for 7/25/19 at 10:00 a.m. and the mediation submission due date of 7/12/19 are cancelled at the request of counsel. Counsel shall contact the Court if and when they wish to reschedule this mediation. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/3/19. (cak) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#6

SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wendy Verlander, Christopher Freeman, and David Gerasimow, filed by Blackbird Tech LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/24/2018. (nms) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

#5

SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to February 9, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Niantic, Inc. answer due 2/9/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/5/2018. (nms) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blackbird Tech LLC. Niantic, Inc. served on 12/20/2017, answer due 1/10/2018. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,802,127. (crb) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Niantic, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2286098.) - filed by Blackbird Tech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER Administratively Closing the case (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2019. (nms) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) SO ORDERED Granting #55 Stipulation and Order to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/16/2019. (nms) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) STIPULATION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review Proceedings by Niantic, Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) Joint Claim Construction Statement, by Blackbird Tech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4, #2 Exhibits 5-8)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/9/2019 (nms). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ORAL ORDER re #38 Order Setting Mediation Conferences: The mediation scheduled for 7/25/19 at 10:00 a.m. and the mediation submission due date of 7/12/19 are cancelled at the request of counsel. Counsel shall contact the Court if and when they wish to reschedule this mediation. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/3/19. (cak) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Clifford Chad Henson by Blackbird Tech LLC (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Niantic's Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Niantic, Inc..(Buckley, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Blackbird Tech LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial List of Proposed Claim Terms filed by Blackbird Tech LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Niantic's Claim Terms for Construction filed by Niantic, Inc..(Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wendy Verlander, Christopher Freeman, and David Gerasimow, filed by Blackbird Tech LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/24/2018. (nms) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wendy Verlander, Christopher Freeman, and David Gerasimow - filed by Blackbird Tech LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to February 9, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Niantic, Inc. answer due 2/9/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/5/2018. (nms) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to February 9, 2018 - filed by Blackbird Tech LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blackbird Tech LLC. Niantic, Inc. served on 12/20/2017, answer due 1/10/2018. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Niantic, Inc. on 12/18/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,802,127. (crb) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Niantic, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2286098.) - filed by Blackbird Tech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Niantic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Blackbird Tech LLC is a litigant