This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2022 at 16:01:37 (UTC).

BKK Working Group et al v. Albertsons Companies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 BKK Working Group filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Albertsons Companies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr, Charles F. Eick, Michael W. Fitzgerald and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-05836

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Andre Birotte Jr

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judges

Charles F. Eick

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rohr, Inc.

Univar USA Inc.

Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC

HP Inc. (formerly known as Hewlett-Packard Company)

Rockwell Automation, Inc.

Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation

Quemetco, Inc.

Defendants

Ciba Geigy Corp.

Ford Aerospace and Communications Corp.

Friction Inc.

Carlton Forge Works

North American Environmental

Beaulieu of America, Inc.

MRC Holdings, Inc.

Hollytex Carpet Mills, Inc.

Albertsons Companies, Inc.

Sumitomo Life Realty

Jeffries Bank Notes Co.

Global Tube Corporation

Cooper Industries, Inc.

117 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

K Eric Adair

Attorney at Hinson Gravelle and Adair LLP

28470 Avenue Stanford, Suite 350

Valencia, CA 91355

Douglas Arthur Gravelle

Attorney at Hinson Gravelle and Adair LLP

28470 Avenue Stanford Suite 350

Valencia, CA 91355

 

Court Documents

#68

(#68) STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#67

(#67) STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

66 #6

Exhibit F (First Amended Third Partial Consent Decree)

66 #5

Exhibit E (Third Partial Consent Decree)

66 #4

Exhibit D (Second Consent Decree)

66 #3

Exhibit C (Amended Consent Decree)

66 #1

Exhibit A (Parcel Map)

66 #66

Main Document

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F (Amended Third Partial Consent Decree)

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E (Third Consent Decree)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D (Second Consent Decree)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C (First Consent Decree)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B (ISE Order)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A (Map)

#1

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,, #63 , filed by Plaintiffs The Boeing Company, Quemetco, Inc., Chevron Marine Products LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, Thums Long Beach Company, HP Inc., Univar USA Inc., BHPI Service LLC, San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Southern California Gas Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Rohm and Haas Company, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, Morton International, Inc., Stauffer Management Company LLC, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Essex Chemical Corporation, Smith International, Inc., Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Ashland LLC, Southern California Edison Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohr, Inc., Mars, Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., United States Steel Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, Mortell Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Gemini Industries, Inc., Oxy USA, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, BKK Working Group, United Technologies Corporation, Bayer Cropscience Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Huntington Beach Company, California Resources Corporation, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Parcel Map), #2 Exhibit B (ISE Order), #3 Exhibit C (Amended Consent Decree), #4 Exhibit D (Second Consent Decree), #5 Exhibit E (Third Partial Consent Decree), #6 Exhibit F (First Amended Third Partial Consent Decree))(Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Second Amended) filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc. identifying Adding The Following Entities (Which Were Not Identified In The First Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement): Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., Filtrol Corporation, Nouryon Chemicals LLC, Inmont Corporation, Morton International, LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC, Univar Solutions USA Inc., Univar Solutions Inc., Dow Inc., and Metals HoldCo, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Allergan, Inc., American Can Company, Ampex Corp., Anco Metal Improvement Co., Ardagh Group S.A., Argo Petroleum Corp., Aurum Industries, Inc., Birtcher Pacific, Cleveland Wrecking Co., Crowley Inc., Desoto Inc., Does, Don Knott Ford, Dresser Industries, Inc., Durex Inc., Electrofilm Inc., FMC Corporation, Federal Reserve Bank, Ford Aerospace and Communications Corp., Foster-Forbes Glass Co., Friction Inc., Friction Materials Corp., GWB (US), Inc., General Mills, Inc., Genstar Building Materials Co., Genstar Roofing Products Company, Glass Containers Corp., Global Tube Corporation, Hi-Shear Corp., Hill Brothers Chemical Co., Hollytex Carpet Mills, Inc., Johnson Controls Inc., Joslyn Manufacturing and Supply Co., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Lisi Aerospace North America, Inc., MRC Holdings, Inc., Mercury Aerospace Fasteners, Mercury Aerospace Inc., North American Environmental, Northrop Pacific, Pillsbury Co., Price Pfister, Rio Tinto Alcan Inc., Sandia Metal Process, Inc., Shuwa Investments Corp., Smith and Co., Stanley Black and Decker, Inc., Structural Composite Industries, Thompson Industries, Thorpe Insulation Co., Vought Aircraft Industries Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,, #14 , filed by Plaintiffs The Boeing Company, Quemetco, Inc., Chevron Marine Products LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, Thums Long Beach Company, HP Inc., Univar USA Inc., BHPI Service LLC, San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Southern California Gas Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Rohm and Haas Company, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, Morton International, Inc., Stauffer Management Company LLC, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Essex Chemical Corporation, Smith International, Inc., Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Ashland LLC, Southern California Edison Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohr, Inc., Mars, Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., United States Steel Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, Mortell Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Gemini Industries, Inc., Oxy USA, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, BKK Working Group, United Technologies Corporation, Bayer Cropscience Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Huntington Beach Company, California Resources Corporation, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Parcel Map), #2 Exhibit B (ISE Order), #3 Exhibit C (Amended Consent Decree), #4 Exhibit D (Second Consent Decree), #5 Exhibit E (Third Partial Consent Decree), #6 Exhibit F (First Amended Third Partial Consent Decree))(Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) ORDER: GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF AMENDING PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND FOR AN ORDER AMENDING THE OPERATIVE STAY ORDER #60 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The current stay is lifted for the limited purpose of amending Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file their Proposed Second Amended Complaint, as attached as Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Douglas A. Gravelle in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion, within 30 days of this Order. (iv) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ORDER: GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH MOTION TO STAY AND EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS #59 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This case shall be stayed until July 20, 2022 for all matters except motions and voluntary dismissals of certain named Defendants by Plaintiffs; and The time for Plaintiffs to serve the Complaint on all remaining Defendants is extended until July 20, 2022. (iv) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay for the Limited Purpose of Amending Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; For an Order Granting Leave to Amend Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; and for an Order Amending the Operative Stay Order filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Douglas Gravelle, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Gravelle Declaration (Copy of [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint), #3 Proposed Order [Proposed[ Order) (Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Fourth NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case and Extend Time to Serve Defendants filed by Plaintiffs American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Anadarko E and P Onshore LLC, Ashland LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BHPI Service LLC, BKK Working Group, Bayer Cropscience Inc., California Resources Corporation, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron Marine Products LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Crosby and Overton, Inc., Ducommun Aerostructures, Inc., Essex Chemical Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gemini Industries, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Latex and Chemical Corporation, HP Inc., Huntington Beach Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mars, Inc., Montrose Chemical Corporation of California, Mortell Company, Morton International, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Douglas Gravelle, #2 Declaration Declaration of Megan Hey, #3 Declaration Declaration of Nelline Kowbel, #4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay #7 by Clerk. The document is stricken. Counsel may file an amended or corrected document. (lom) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Until July 3, 2019 for all matters except voluntary dismissals of certain named defendants by Plaintiffs , and extending time for Plaintiffs to serve Complaint on remaining defendants until July 3, #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Motion lacks a formally noticed hearing date, Local Rules 6-1 and 7-4. Judge Birotte hears civil motions on Fridays at 10:00 AM. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (smo) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 10 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Until July 3, 2019 for all matters except voluntary dismissals of certain named defendants by Plaintiffs , and extending time for Plaintiffs to serve Complaint on remaining defendants until July 3, 2019, filed by Plaintiffs National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc., Quemetco, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohm and Haas Company, Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Smith International, Inc., Southern California Edison Company, Southern California Gas Company, Stauffer Management Company LLC, The Boeing Company, The Dow Chemical Company, The Procter and Gamble Manufacturing Company, Thums Long Beach Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pacific Railroad Southern Pacific Transportation Company, United States Steel Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Univar USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Douglas A. Gravelle in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion) (Gravelle, Douglas) Modified on 7/10/2018 (lom). (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff BKK Working Group. Related Case(s): 18-05810; 16-08127; 05-07746; 10-03378; 14-09178; 15-00729; and 14-09085 (Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES PURSUANT TO L.R. 7.1-1 (BY ALL PLAINTIFFS) filed by Plaintiff BKK Working Group (Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BKK Working Group. (Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22032020 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BKK Working Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Map), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (ISE Order), #3 Exhibit Exhibit C (First Consent Decree), #4 Exhibit Exhibit D (Second Consent Decree), #5 Exhibit Exhibit E (Third Consent Decree), #6 Exhibit Exhibit F (Amended Third Partial Consent Decree)) (Attorney Douglas Arthur Gravelle added to party BKK Working Group(pty:pla))(Gravelle, Douglas) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beaulieu of America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MRC HOLDINGS, INC. SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN CAN COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ROHR INC. DBA GOODRICH AEROSPACE is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVAR USA INC A CORPORATION is a litigant