This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2019 at 07:56:04 (UTC).

Bittner et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Bittner filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Mahoney and Leonard T Strand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-04091

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Leonard T Strand

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sherry Van Tol

Stephanie Bittner

Rebecca Miller

Defendant

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dominic F Pechota

Attorney at Trial Lawyers for Justice, P.C.

421 West Water Street, 3Rd Floor, ***Ecf

Decorah, IA 52101

Nicholas C Rowley

Attorney at Trial Lawyers for Justice

421 W Water St, Po Box 228, ***Ecf

Decorah, IA 52101

William D Sims

Attorney at Northern Plains Justice, LLP

4301 W 57Th Street, Suite 121, ***Ecf

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Matthew James Reilly

Attorney at Trial Lawyers for Justice

421 W Water Street, 3Rd Floor, ***Ecf

Decorah, IA 52101

Defendant Attorneys

Kathleen Li Reitz

Attorney at Meagher & Geer PLLP

33 S 6Th Street, Suite 4400, Ecf

Minneapolis, MN 55402

John Christopher Hughes

Attorney at Meagher & Geer PLLP

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400, Ecf

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC: Exhibits marked: Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC: Motions in Limine 21 days before FPTC: Jury Trial set for 07/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Final Pretrial Conference set for 07/14/2020 at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Proposed Pretrial Order ddl 07/11/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/17/18. (kfs) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 1/15/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 2/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 9/19/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 10/15/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 11/15/2019. Discovery due by 11/4/2019. Completion of Expert Depositions due by 1/15/2020. Motions due by 2/3/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 7/7/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 12/10/2018. (mmc) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#10

(#10) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 12/10/2018. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (mmc) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#9

(#9) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Hughes, John) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

8 #1

Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan

#8

(#8) ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 11:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 12/07/18. (Attachment #1 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan) (kfs) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Hughes, John) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (skm). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John C. Hughes on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/27/2018. (mmc) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

4 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John C. Hughes ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2818000) by Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Reitz, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#3

(#3) DOCKET Annotation: Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#2

(#2) STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Stephanie Bittner, Rebecca Miller, Sherry Van Tol (des) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Clay County District Court, case number LACV032196. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2815053), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 1/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reitz, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC: Exhibits marked: Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC: Motions in Limine 21 days before FPTC: Jury Trial set for 07/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Final Pretrial Conference set for 07/14/2020 at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Proposed Pretrial Order ddl 07/11/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/17/18. (kfs) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 1/15/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 2/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 9/19/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 10/15/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 11/15/2019. Discovery due by 11/4/2019. Completion of Expert Depositions due by 1/15/2020. Motions due by 2/3/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 7/7/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 12/10/2018. (mmc) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 12/10/2018. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (mmc) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Hughes, John) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 11:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 12/07/18. (Attachment #1 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan) (kfs) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Reset Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/10/2018: Action taken pursuant to 7 Order (kfs) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • (#7) ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Granting Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's oral motion to extend the Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Deadline from December 6, 2018, to December 10, 2018. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/04/2018. (Gollhofer, Jami) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Hughes, John) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (skm). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John C. Hughes on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/27/2018. (mmc) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John C. Hughes ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2818000) by Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Reitz, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/6/2018. (jjh) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DOCKET Annotation: Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Stephanie Bittner, Rebecca Miller, Sherry Van Tol (des) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DOCKET Annotation: Case opened in wrong division as case number 18cv119 - clerk notified Financial Department and attorneys of corrected case number (des) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Clay County District Court, case number LACV032196. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2815053), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 1/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reitz, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.