This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2021 at 18:42:41 (UTC).

Bitstamp, Ltd v. Ripple Labs Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2015 Bitstamp, Ltd filed an Other lawsuit against Ripple Labs Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-01503

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Cross Defendant

Bitstamp Ltd.

Defendants, Counter Defendants and Cross Claimants

Nancy Harris

Ripple Labs Inc.

Mr. Jed McCaleb

Stellar Development Foundation

Jacob Stephenson

Cross Defendants, Counter Defendants, Cross Claimants and Defendants

Ripple Labs Inc.

Bitstamp Ltd.

Stellar Development Foundation

Mr. Jed McCaleb

Jacob Stephenson

George Frost

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Claimant

Stellar Development Foundation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

George Frost

Attorney at Law Office of George Frost

2930 Magnolia St

Berkeley, CA 94705

Jessica Koren Nall

Attorney at Farella Braun Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kelly Ann Woodruff

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Russ Building, 30Th Floor, 235 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Christopher C. Wheeler, Esq.

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Andrew Robert Ardinger

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 5600

Seattle, WA 98104-7097

Gabriel M. Ramsey

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Paul Francis Rugani

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington Sutcliffe

701 5Th Ave., Suite 5600

Seattle, WA 98104

Mark Steven Parris

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

701 Fifth Ave, Suite 5700

Seattle, WA 98104

Nicole Lynn Chessari

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

601 Marshall Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

Richard M Strassberg

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Grant P. Fondo

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

601 Marshall Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

Terry Gross

Attorney at Gross & Belsky P.C.

201 Spear Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Adam C. Belsky

Attorney at Gross & Belsky P.C.

201 Spear Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94105

George Frost

Attorney at Law Office of George Frost

2930 Magnolia St

Berkeley, CA 94705

Jessica Koren Nall

Attorney at Farella Braun Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kelly Ann Woodruff

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Russ Building, 30Th Floor, 235 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Christopher C. Wheeler, Esq.

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Darrell Rae Atkinson

Attorney at Hosie Rice LLP

600 Montgomery St., 34Th Floor, Transamerica Pyramid

San Francisco, CA 94111

Spencer Hosie

Attorney at Hosie Rice LLP

600 Montgomery Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Diane Sue Rice

Attorney at Hosie Rice LLP

600 Montgomery Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Anthony Kenhong Lee

Attorney at Hosie Rice LLP

600 Montgomery Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Counter Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Nicole Lynn Chessari

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

601 Marshall Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

Richard M Strassberg

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Grant P. Fondo

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

601 Marshall Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

George Frost

Attorney at Law Office of George Frost

2930 Magnolia St

Berkeley, CA 94705

Jessica Koren Nall

Attorney at Farella Braun Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kelly Ann Woodruff

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Russ Building, 30Th Floor, 235 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Christopher C. Wheeler, Esq.

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#181

#180

#179

#178

#177

#176

#175

#174

#173

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#4

#1

265 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#181) AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ANDRETURN THE DISPUTED FUNDS AND XRP DEPOSITED WITH THE COURT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #180 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016) (Entered: 04/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#180) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Amended) to Dismiss this Action with Prejudice and Return the Disputed Funds and XRP Deposited with the Court filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/12/2016) (Entered: 04/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#179) Receipt reflecting delivery of 125 sealed document (the private key to the 96,342,361.6 Interpleaded XRP to counsel for Ripple Labs, Inc. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016) (Entered: 04/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#178) Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #176 Stipulation. The Court shall deliver the $942,138.24 Interpleaded Funds currently in the Court's registry to SDF by sending a check payable to Stellar Development Foundation to SDF's counsel, Gross Belsky Alonso LLP. The Clerk of the Court is directed to deliver to a representative of Ripple, the private key to the 96,342,361.6 Interpleaded XRP previously filed on August 19, 2015, Dkt. 125, and referenced as "sealed document" in the Court docket. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#177) Letter from Nicole L. Chessari Regarding Private Key. (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 4/1/2016) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#176) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss this Action with Prejudice and Return the Disputed Funds and XRP Deposited with the Court filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 3/31/2016) (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#175) ORDER granting #174 STIPULATION to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Ripple Labs Inc. Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/22/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#174) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 2/22/2016) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by TL on 2/11/16. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#173) STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Ripple Labs Inc., Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 2/8/2016) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
174 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grant P. Fondo in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Redacted Version of Answer and Cross-Complaint, #3 Unredacted Version of Answer and Cross-Complaint, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Proposed Order)(Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/30/2015) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson byRipple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/29/2015) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ripple Labs Inc. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/29/2015) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Lynn Chessari (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 4/29/2015) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant P. Fondo (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/29/2015) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Ripple Labs Inc., Jacob Stephenson. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Bitstamp Ltd. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2015 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9409396.). Filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frost, George) (Filed on 4/1/2015) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ripple Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Koren Nall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher C. Wheeler, Esq.