This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2019 at 07:11:48 (UTC).

BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE v. DETZNER et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against DETZNER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J FRANK and MARK E WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00536

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

Presiding Judge

MARK E WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE

Defendants

KEN DETZNER

PALM BEACH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD

SUSAN M BUCHER

Intervenor Defendant

NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP - WASHINGTON DC

700 13Th Street Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

500 S Bronough Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

ASHLEY E DAVIS

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

Ra Gray Building, 500 South Bronough Street, Suite 100

Tallahassee, FL 32399

GARY VERGIL PERKO

Attorney at HOPPING GREEN & SAMS PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

119 S Monroe St - Ste 300

Tallahassee, FL 32301

MALCOLM NOBLE MEANS

Attorney at HOPPING GREEN & SAMS PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

119 S Monroe St - Ste 300

Tallahassee, FL 32301

MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL

Attorney at HOPPING GREEN & SAMS PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

119 S Monroe St Ste 300

Tallahassee, FL 32301

ANDREW BAUMANN, I

Attorney at LEWIS LONGMAN &

515 N Flagler Dr, Ste1500

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

NATALIE KATO

Attorney at LEWIS LONGMAN & WALKER PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

315 S Calhoun St, Ste 830

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

KIMBERLY TOLLAND MYDOCK

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP - JACKSONVILLE FL

50 N Laura St - Ste 3300

Jacksonville, FL 32202

ANDY V BARDOS

Attorney at GRAYROBINSON PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

301 S Bronough St Ste 600

Tallahassee, FL 32301

JASON BRETT TORCHINSKY

Attorney at HOLTZMAN VOGEL JOSEFIAK PLLC - WARRENTON VA

45 N Hill Dr, Ste 100

Warrenton, VA 20186

ROBERT ERIC BILIK

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP - JACKSONVILLE FL

50 N Laura St - Ste 3300

Jacksonville, FL 32202

GEORGE TY LEVESQUE

Attorney at GRAYROBINSON PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

301 S Bronough St Ste 600

Tallahassee, FL 32301

JOHN DONLEY ADAMS

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP - RICHMOND VA

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

MATTHEW ALLEN FITZGERALD

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP - RICHMOND VA

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

RESTRICTED

#23

#20

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #29 ORDER CLOSING FILE. (kjw) 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 2/28/2019. (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER CLOSING FILE. Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal dismissing with prejudice this action. ECF No. #28 . The Clerk must enter judgment stating, "This case is dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)." The Clerk must close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/30/2018. (kjw) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE (NKWONTA, UZOMA) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Secretary's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings in All Pending Cases by KEN DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct document title. (kjw) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER: The parties are directed to confer and, after conferral, file indication of how they intend to proceed in this Court. The parties shall file this notice on or before 11/30/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/19/18. (amm) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by JASON BRETT TORCHINSKY on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (TORCHINSKY, JASON) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Proceedings held on 11/16/2018, before Judge Mark E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 850-422-0011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2019. (mah) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Status Conference held on 11/16/2018. Parties discuss #20 Plaintiff's response requesting production of documents. Evidentiary hearing not held (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Evidentiary Hearing Re: #20 Request for Production of Documents set for 11/16/2018 06:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. s/ Victoria Milton McGee Courtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER SETTING HEARING re #20 Response - This Court has considered, without hearing, Plaintiffs response requesting the production of documents. ECF No. 20. This matter shall be set for an emergency hearing on November 16, 2018, at 6:00 p.m. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/16/2018. (vkm) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE TY LEVESQUE on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (LEVESQUE, GEORGE) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Uzoma N. Nkwonta.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4337177.) by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE. (NKWONTA, UZOMA) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew A. Fitzgerald.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4337147.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Adams.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4337142.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KIMBERLY TOLLAND MYDOCK on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (MYDOCK, KIMBERLY) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ERIC BILIK on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (BILIK, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO INTERVENE. This Court has considered, without hearing, The National Republican Senatorial Committees Emergency Motion to Intervene. ECF No. #3 . The motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/16/2018. (kjw) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Emergency MOTION to Intervene by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (BARDOS, ANDY) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PERKO, GARY) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KEN DETZNER from Leon County Circuit Court, case number 2018-CA-002445. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4336753.), filed by KEN DETZNER. (PERKO, GARY) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Donley Adams

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIMBERLY TOLLAND MYDOCK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDY V BARDOS