This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:43 (UTC).

Bicknell v. Wetumpka Sheriff's Department

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Bicknell filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Wetumpka Sheriff's Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04029

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Barrett Bicknell

Bainbridge, GA 39818

Defendant

Wetumpka Sheriff's Department

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by John Barrett Bicknell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTICE Of Filing Additional Information (Medical Bills and Pictures from beating) filed by John Barrett Bicknell. (Attachments: #1 Medical Bills, #2 Pictures)(ddm) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

4 #2

Pictures

4 #1

Medical Bills

#5

(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING this civil action to the Northern Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/25/2018. (jtj) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Barrett Bicknell re #5 Order. Released. (jtj) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to TRANSFER this file to the Northern Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama for further proceedings if there are no objections filed within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Should objections be filed, the Clerk should await a further Order from the District Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/28/2018. (btql) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Barrett Bicknell re #5 Order. Released. (jtj) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Civil Case Terminated. (jtj) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Case transferred ELECTRONICALLY to the Northern Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama. (jtj) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to John Barrett Bicknell re #5 Order. (jtj) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING this civil action to the Northern Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/25/2018. (jtj) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #3 Order to District Judge Amy Totenberg. Defendant submitted additional documentation at #4 . (jtj) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE Of Filing Additional Information (Medical Bills and Pictures from beating) filed by John Barrett Bicknell. (Attachments: #1 Medical Bills, #2 Pictures)(ddm) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to John Barrett Bicknell re #3 Order. (btql) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard terminated per #3 Order. (btql) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to TRANSFER this file to the Northern Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama for further proceedings if there are no objections filed within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Should objections be filed, the Clerk should await a further Order from the District Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/28/2018. (btql) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (eop) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by John Barrett Bicknell. (eop) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by John Barrett Bicknell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.