Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2018 at 07:26:43 (UTC).

Bibbs v. Liberty Mutual Insurance

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Bibbs filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shirley Padmore Mensah and Henry Edward Autrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01739

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Shirley Padmore Mensah

Henry Edward Autrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elmore Bibbs

Defendants

Liberty Mutual Insurance

LM Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter P. Fiore, Jr.

1221 Locust Street, Suite 800

St. Louis, MO 63103-2364

Jeffrey T. Weisman

Attorney at WEISMAN LAW FIM

1221 Locust St., Suite 800

St. Louis, MO 63103

Defendant Attorney

Bruce A. Moothart

Attorney at SEYFERTH AND BLUMENTHAL

4801 Main Street, Suite 310

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant LM Insurance Corporation. Parent companies: Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc.; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc.; Liberty Mutual Group Inc.; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Moothart, Bruce) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint, by LM Insurance Corporation.(Moothart, Bruce) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#18

(#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant LM Insurance Corporation Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Jury Demand demand, filed by Elmore Bibbs. (Terminating Liberty Mutual Insurance) Related document: #1 Notice of Removal Petition, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance.(KJS) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

16 #1

Exhibit first amended petition

#16

(#16) MOTION to Amend/Correct Petition by Plaintiff Elmore Bibbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit first amended petition)(Weisman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Peter Fiore ADR Completion Deadline due by 7/1/2019. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 7/15/2019. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 5/22/2019. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/27/18. (CLA) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: standard Motion to Join Parties due by 12/14/2018. Discovery Completion due by 8/1/2019. ADR Future Reference 5/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2020 09:30 AM before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/27/18. (CLA) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 set for November 27, 2018, is vacated. The Case Management Order will be issued based on the dates provided by the parties in their Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/27/18. (CLA) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#12

(#12) REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (KXS) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#4

(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Elmore Bibbs.(BAK) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance.(Moothart, Bruce) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance. Parent companies: Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Moothart, Bruce) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

1 #5

Original Filing Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - efiling confirmation

1 #2

Exhibit B - Daugherty Declaration

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Petition

#1

(#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant LM Insurance Corporation Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Jury Demand demand, filed by Elmore Bibbs. (Terminating Liberty Mutual Insurance) Related document: #1 Notice of Removal Petition, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance.(KJS) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant LM Insurance Corporation. Parent companies: Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc.; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc.; Liberty Mutual Group Inc.; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Moothart, Bruce) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint, by LM Insurance Corporation.(Moothart, Bruce) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant LM Insurance Corporation Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Jury Demand demand, filed by Elmore Bibbs. (Terminating Liberty Mutual Insurance) Related document: #1 Notice of Removal Petition, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance.(KJS) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Petition filed by Elmore Bibbs ; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/29/18. (KJS) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Amend/Correct Petition by Plaintiff Elmore Bibbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit first amended petition)(Weisman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Peter Fiore ADR Completion Deadline due by 7/1/2019. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 7/15/2019. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 5/22/2019. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/27/18. (CLA) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: standard Motion to Join Parties due by 12/14/2018. Discovery Completion due by 8/1/2019. ADR Future Reference 5/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2020 09:30 AM before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/27/18. (CLA) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 set for November 27, 2018, is vacated. The Case Management Order will be issued based on the dates provided by the parties in their Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/27/18. (CLA) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (KXS) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: This matter is before the court on its own motion. I have determined that I should not preside in this case because of a conflict of interest or an appearance of impropriety. The Clerk of the District Court is hereby directed to refer this case to another judge by random selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 11/27/18. (KEK) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Elmore Bibbs. . (Weisman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/20/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/27/2018 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/20/2018. [SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS] Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 10/26/18. (KEK) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Plaintiff Elmore Bibbs for Co-Counsel Notices (Weisman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • (#6) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE Filing Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal: by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B - efiling confirmation)(Moothart, Bruce) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Elmore Bibbs.(BAK) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance.(Moothart, Bruce) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance. Parent companies: Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Moothart, Bruce) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Jury Demand from City of St. Louis Circuit Court, case number 1822-CC11098, with receipt number 0865-6810618, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Daugherty Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - efiling confirmation, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Moothart, Bruce) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LM Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce A. Moothart