This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 08:01:05 (UTC).

Bester v. Law Library USA et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Bester filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Law Library USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David E Jones and Lynn Adelman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01548

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David E Jones

Lynn Adelman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Jane Bester

Milwaukee, WI 53233

Defendants

Oval Office in the White House

Civilization of all the Earth

Law Library USA

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Civilization of all the Earth, Law Library USA, Oval Office in the White House filed by Mary Jane Bester. Jury Demand. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge David E Jones. (kah) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/1/18. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff)(jad)

#4

(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS ACTION ON PRELIMINARY REVIEW signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 10/15/18. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice according to 28 U.S.C. 1915. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs Non-Prisoner Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee, ECF No. #2 , be DENIED as moot. IT IS ALSO RECOMMENDED that the Clerk of Court enter judgment that Plaintiff shall take nothing from the Complaint. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(kah)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Mary Jane Bester. (kah) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/31/18 accepting #4 Report and Recommendations and denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (jad) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • Case Terminated (bx) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/1/18. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff)(jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/31/18 accepting #4 Report and Recommendations and denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (jad) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS ACTION ON PRELIMINARY REVIEW signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 10/15/18. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice according to 28 U.S.C. 1915. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs Non-Prisoner Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee, ECF No. #2 , be DENIED as moot. IT IS ALSO RECOMMENDED that the Clerk of Court enter judgment that Plaintiff shall take nothing from the Complaint. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff)(kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mary Jane Bester. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kah) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Mary Jane Bester. (kah) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Civilization of all the Earth, Law Library USA, Oval Office in the White House filed by Mary Jane Bester. Jury Demand. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge David E Jones. (kah) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.