This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2019 at 08:20:02 (UTC).

BES Design/Build, LLC v. United States Fire Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2018 BES Design/Build, LLC filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against United States Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Edwin G. Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-25134

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BES Design/Build, LLC

Defendant

United States Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Matthew Milam

Attorney at Milam , Milam, LLC

2206 Main Street

Daphne, AL 36526

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - USFIC Bond

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to United States Fire Insurance Company by BES Design/Build, LLC re #1 Complaint, filed by BES Design/Build, LLC (Milam, Adam) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters., Notice of Court Practice re Standing Order Setting Discovery Procedures. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Subcontract

#4

(#4) NOTICE by BES Design/Build, LLC re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Milam, Adam) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT United States for the Use and Benefit of BES Design Build, LLC against United States Fire Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11219191, filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of BES Design Build, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subcontract, #2 Exhibit 2 - USFIC Bond)(Milam, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to United States Fire Insurance Company. (dj) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters., Notice of Court Practice re Standing Order Setting Discovery Procedures. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to United States Fire Insurance Company. (dj) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by BES Design/Build, LLC re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Milam, Adam) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to United States Fire Insurance Company by BES Design/Build, LLC re #1 Complaint, filed by BES Design/Build, LLC (Milam, Adam) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT United States for the Use and Benefit of BES Design Build, LLC against United States Fire Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11219191, filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of BES Design Build, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subcontract, #2 Exhibit 2 - USFIC Bond)(Milam, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.