This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2018 at 07:47:34 (UTC).

Berry v. Infinity Funding III, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2018 Berry filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Infinity Funding III, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00345

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephanie Berry

Defendants

Wakefield & Associates, Inc.

Infinity Funding III, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent S Snyder

Attorney at Banks & Jones

2125 Middlebrook Pike

Knoxville, TN 37921

Alan C Lee

Attorney at Alan C. Lee, Attorney

Post Office Box 1357

Talbott, TN 37877-1357

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file on or before October 12, 2018 a response showing good cause why her claims against Defendants should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/28/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3750804.), filed by Stephanie Berry. (Attachments: #1 Other cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Summons, #3 Exhibit Alias Summons, #4 Summons Infinity, #5 Summons Wakefield)(Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

5 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/23/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

1 #5

Summons Wakefield

#9

(#9) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Stephanie Berry. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 09/30/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Infinity Funding III, LLC, Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DJH, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

1 #4

Summons Infinity

1 #3

Exhibit Alias Summons

1 #1

Other cover sheet

#3

(#3) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/23/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Berry. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 8/27/2018. (Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit Original Summons

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Stephanie Berry (Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#2

(#2) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/23/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Berry. Infinity Funding III, LLC served on 8/27/2018. (Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Stephanie Berry (Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Stephanie Berry. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 09/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file on or before October 12, 2018 a response showing good cause why her claims against Defendants should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/28/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Berry. Infinity Funding III, LLC served on 8/27/2018. (Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Berry. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 8/27/2018. (Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Infinity Funding III, LLC, Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DJH, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/23/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/23/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/23/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3750804.), filed by Stephanie Berry. (Attachments: #1 Other cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Summons, #3 Exhibit Alias Summons, #4 Summons Infinity, #5 Summons Wakefield)(Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.