This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2018 at 07:53:14 (UTC).

Berry v. Citi Credit Bureau et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Berry filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Citi Credit Bureau. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Diane K. Vescovo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02654

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chandra L Berry

Cordova, TN 38018

Defendants

Trans Union, LLC

Citi Credit Bureau

Not Classified By Court

Clerk Edward L. Stanton, Jr.

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Anthony

Attorney at BONE MCALLESTER NORTON PLLC

511 Union Street, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37219

Katherine E. Carlton Robinson

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) STIPULATION Selecting ADR Mediator by Trans Union, LLC. (Carlton Robinson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 11/9/2018. (Vescovo, Diane) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#17

(#17) ORDER ON #16 TRANS UNION, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 11/5/2018. (Vescovo, Diane) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference (proposed Order submitted) by Trans Union, LLC. (Carlton Robinson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#15

(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting , Proposed Standard Track Scheduling Order. (Carlton Robinson, Katherine) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#13

(#13) AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/24/18. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#10

(#12) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION [Text Only - No Image Attached]: (re #10 Setting Letter) Scheduling Conference set before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/7/2018 is CANCELLED. (tlh) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

8 #2

Certificate of Good Standing (2)

8 #1

Certificate of Good Standing (1)

#8

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/10/18. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#7

(#7) Trans Union, LLC's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Anthony, David) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

(#3) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion for Trans Union, LLC.. (Anthony, David) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint filed in the General Session Court

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons filed in the General Session Court

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union, LLC from Shelby County General Session, case number 1943346 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2886783), filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons filed in the General Session Court, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint filed in the General Session Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anthony, David) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION Selecting ADR Mediator by Trans Union, LLC. (Carlton Robinson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 11/9/2018. (Vescovo, Diane) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (#18) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo: Scheduling Conference held on 11/7/2018. Pro Se Plaintiff present. Counsel for the defendant present via telephone. Proposed Scheduling Order submitted. The Court verified the Plaintiffs contact information. The Court discussed the deadlines/date with the parties. The Court discussed case consolidation with the parties. The Court will enter the Scheduling Order. (Plaintiffs Counsel: Pro Se. Defendants Counsel: Katherine Robinson.) (Tape #FTR) (cas) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER ON #16 TRANS UNION, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 11/5/2018. (Vescovo, Diane) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference (proposed Order submitted) by Trans Union, LLC. (Carlton Robinson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting , Proposed Standard Track Scheduling Order. (Carlton Robinson, Katherine) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • (#14) Notice of Setting. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 11/7/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo. *TEXT NOTICE ONLY - THERE IS NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE*(cas) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/24/18. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION [Text Only - No Image Attached]: (re #10 Setting Letter) Scheduling Conference set before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/7/2018 is CANCELLED. (tlh) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • (#11) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/23/18. (Lipman, Sheryl) Modified on 10/23/2018 (Lipman, Sheryl). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 11/7/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/10/18. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2898880) by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (1), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (2))(Carlton Robinson, Katherine) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Trans Union, LLC's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Anthony, David) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion for Trans Union, LLC.. (Anthony, David) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union, LLC from Shelby County General Session, case number 1943346 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2886783), filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons filed in the General Session Court, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint filed in the General Session Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anthony, David) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less