This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2019 at 08:05:52 (UTC).

Bernier et al v. Sam's East, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 Bernier filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sam's East, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Edward G. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01231

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Edward G. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Bernier

Lisa Bernier

Defendants

Walmart, Inc.

Sam's East, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Kathy Blount

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Daniel Nowlin

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BENJAMIN S. HARMON

270 Main Street

Savannah, TN 38372

Defendant Attorneys

Russell E. Reviere

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL, PLC - Jackson

209 E. Main Street, P.O. Box 1147

Jackson, TN 38302-1147

Brandon W. Reedy

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL PLC

209 East Main Street, P.O. Box 1147

Jackson, TN 38301

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (skc) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's East, Inc. from Circuit Court of Madison County, case number C-18-247 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2928883), filed by Sam's East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sam's East, Inc.. (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon W. Reedy on behalf of Sam's East, Inc. (Reedy, Brandon) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sam's East, Inc..(Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF RESETTING #11 (Scheduling Conference reset for 2/21/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson.). Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 1/16/2019. (mbb) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#9

(#9) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference, proposed order submitted by Sam's East, Inc.. (Reedy, Brandon) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Sam's East, Inc. of Service of First Interrogatories and RFP (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF RESETTING #11 (Scheduling Conference reset for 2/21/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson.). Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 1/16/2019. (mbb) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference, proposed order submitted by Sam's East, Inc.. (Reedy, Brandon) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon W. Reedy on behalf of Sam's East, Inc. (Reedy, Brandon) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Sam's East, Inc. of Service of First Interrogatories and RFP (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sam's East, Inc..(Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (skc) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sam's East, Inc.. (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's East, Inc. from Circuit Court of Madison County, case number C-18-247 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2928883), filed by Sam's East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.