This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2019 at 07:39:42 (UTC).

Beringson v. Silo, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 Beringson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Silo, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01367

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristin Beringson

Defendant

Silo, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A. Ryan Simmons

Attorney at Employment & Consumer Law Group

525 4Th Avenue South

Nashville, TN 37210

Jonathan A. Street

Attorney at Employment & Consumer Law Group

525 4Th Avenue South

Nashville, TN 37210

Defendant Attorney

Darrick Lee O'Dell

Attorney at Spicer Rudstrom, PLLC (Nashville Office)

414 Union Street, Suite 1700

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/8/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

10 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference by Silo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Darrick) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Silo, LLC.(O'Dell, Darrick) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#8

(#8) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Silo, LLC. (O'Dell, Darrick) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Darrick Lee O'Dell on behalf of Silo, LLC (O'Dell, Darrick) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/11/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons issued as to Silo, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

1 #2

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Silo, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2813612), filed by Kristin Beringson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/8/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference by Silo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Darrick) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Darrick Lee O'Dell. (mg) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Silo, LLC.(O'Dell, Darrick) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Silo, LLC. (O'Dell, Darrick) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Darrick Lee O'Dell on behalf of Silo, LLC (O'Dell, Darrick) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/11/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons issued as to Silo, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan A. Street, and A. Ryan Simmons. (mg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Silo, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2813612), filed by Kristin Beringson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.