This case was last updated from PACER on 02/12/2019 at 07:33:57 (UTC).

Berg v. INTL FC Stone, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 Berg filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against INTL FC Stone, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00465

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anne M. Berg

Defendant

INTL FC Stone, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kellie Lynne Paschke

Attorney at SKINNER & PASCHKE PLLC

204 W. Hickman Road

Waukee, IA 50263

Defendant Attorneys

Debra Hulett

Attorney at NYEMASTER GOODE PC

700 Walnut Street, Suite 1600

Des Moines, IA 50309-3899

Ryan Joseph Stefani

Attorney at NYEMASTER GOODE PC

700 Walnut Street, Suite 1600

Des Moines, IA 50309-3899

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Affidavit of James Richey

1 #1

Exhibit A

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Anne Berg

4 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Remand

#8

(#8) REPLY to Defendant's Resistance re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Anne M. Berg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Anne Berg)(Paschke, Kellie) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INTL FC Stone, Inc. from Iowa District Court for Dallas County, case number LACV041449. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3676645., filed by INTL FC Stone, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Statement of Reason Rule 81(a))(Hulett, Debra) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit D

#9

(#9) ORDER Denying #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 2/6/2019. (hfh) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C

#4

(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anne M. Berg.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(Paschke, Kellie) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#10

(#10) Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File under Seal by INTL FC Stone, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 2/25/2019. (Hulett, Debra) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Statement of Reason Rule 81(a)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File under Seal by INTL FC Stone, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 2/25/2019. (Hulett, Debra) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Denying #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 2/6/2019. (hfh) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPLY to Defendant's Resistance re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Anne M. Berg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Anne Berg)(Paschke, Kellie) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TEXT ORDER Granting #5 Defendant's Motion to Stay Deadline to Move or Plead. The deadline to move or plead is stayed until 7 days after the Court rules on #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 1/24/2019. (hfh) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by INTL FC Stone, Inc.. Replies due by 1/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James Richey, #2 Affidavit of Debra Hulett)(Hulett, Debra) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unresisted MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by INTL FC Stone, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 2/7/2019. (Stefani, Ryan) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Anne M. Berg.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(Paschke, Kellie) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 1/14/2019. (bp) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Reset Deadlines: INTL FC Stone, Inc. answer due 1/25/2019. (bp) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/14/2018. (imk) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Move or Plead by INTL FC Stone, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 12/28/2018. (Hulett, Debra) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INTL FC Stone, Inc. from Iowa District Court for Dallas County, case number LACV041449. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3676645., filed by INTL FC Stone, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Statement of Reason Rule 81(a))(Hulett, Debra) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.