This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2018 at 08:21:46 (UTC).

BENSON v. WETZEL et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 BENSON filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against WETZEL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Lanzillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00348

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Lanzillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DION BENSON

Marienville, PA 16239

Defendants

M. OVERMEYER

SGT. LEHNHARDT

CAPT. CARTER

JOHN WETZEL

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) US Marshal's Return as to Order, Complaint, Notice and Waiver executed on 12/17/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

10 #1

Envelope Correspondence mailed in

#10

(#10) Remark: Letter to the Court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Correspondence mailed in) (ksa) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER that the Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order to defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/21/2018. (dm) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#8

(#8) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by DION BENSON. (ksa) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. Plaintiff may renew his motion, if he so desires, should Plaintiff's claim survive summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/9/2018. (dm) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DION BENSON. (ksa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

4 #11

Exhibit K

4 #10

Exhibit J

4 #7

Exhibit G

4 #6

Exhibit F

4 #5

Exhibit E

4 #4

Exhibit D

4 #3

Exhibit C

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against CARTER, LEHNHARDT, M. OVERMEYER, JOHN WETZEL Filing fee $400, ), filed by DION BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (ksa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) US Marshal's Return as to Order, Complaint, Notice and Waiver executed on 12/17/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Remark: Letter to the Court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Correspondence mailed in) (ksa) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Service copies placed in US Marshal box. (dm) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER that the Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order to defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/21/2018. (dm) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by DION BENSON. (ksa) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. Plaintiff may renew his motion, if he so desires, should Plaintiff's claim survive summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/9/2018. (dm) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DION BENSON. (ksa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DION BENSON. (ksa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against CARTER, LEHNHARDT, M. OVERMEYER, JOHN WETZEL Filing fee $400, ), filed by DION BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (ksa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by DION BENSON. (ksa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Authorization or Withdrawal of Action) (dm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DION BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Authorization to be Completed by Prisoner Who Seeks Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Inmate Account Statement, #3 Complaint, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #16 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge or District Judge Option, #17 Envelope Documents mailed in) (ksa) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less