This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2018 at 07:44:45 (UTC).

Belton, M.D. v. Borg & Ide Imaging, P.C. et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2018 Belton, M D filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Borg Ide Imaging, P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David G. Larimer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-06776

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David G. Larimer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruby Belton, M.D.

Defendants

Borg & Ide Imaging, P.C.

Radnet, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lucinda Odell Lapoff

Attorney at Trevett, Cristo, Salzer & Andolina P.C.

2 State Street, Suite 1000

Rochester, NY 14614-1803

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Jo S. Korona

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 E. Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

Stacey E. Trien

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 E. Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons to Borg & Ide Imaging, P.C.

1 #3

Summons to Radnet, Inc.

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER granting defendants' letter request for an extension of time to answer or otherwise move against the #1 Complaint. Defendants' answer is due on or before 2/5/19. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 12/6/18. (PR) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey E. Trien on behalf of Radnet, Inc. (Trien, Stacey) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Jo S. Korona on behalf of Radnet, Inc. (Korona, Mary Jo) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TEXT ORDER granting defendant Borg & Ide Imaging's letter request for an extension of time to file an Answer or otherwise move against the #1 Complaint. Defendant's answer is due on or before 1/4/2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 11/26/18. (PR) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey E. Trien on behalf of Borg & Ide Imaging, P.C. (Trien, Stacey) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Jo S. Korona on behalf of Borg & Ide Imaging, P.C. (Korona, Mary Jo) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint to Radnet, Inc. served on Cheri Calabrese on 11/15/18, filed by Ruby Belton, M.D.. (Lapoff, Lucinda) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint to Borg & Ide Imaging, P.C. served on Cheri Calabrese on 11/15/18, filed by Ruby Belton, M.D.. (Lapoff, Lucinda) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (MD) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Borg & Ide Imaging, P.C., Radnet, Inc. (JHF) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. David G. Larimer. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Borg & Ide Imaging, P.C., Radnet, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3262167, filed by Ruby Belton, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Borg & Ide Imaging, P.C., #3 Summons to Radnet, Inc.)(Lapoff, Lucinda) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RADNET MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacey E. Trien