This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2018 at 07:43:21 (UTC).

Bellatreche et al v. Southern Trust Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 Bellatreche filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Southern Trust Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00363

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Pamela L Reeves

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dhia Alfatlawy

Mounira Omer Bellatreche

Defendant

Southern Trust Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryce W McKenzie

Attorney at Law Offices of Bryan E. Delius

124 Court Avenue, Suite 101

Sevierville, TN 37862

Defendant Attorney

Terrill L Adkins

Attorney at Trammell, Adkins & Ward, PC

Post Office Box 51450

Knoxville, TN 37950-1450

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing Fee received, $400.00 Receipt #0649-3761908), filed by Southern Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Adkins, Terrill) Modified to add receipt # on 9/5/2018 (JBR). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint ND CLAIM FOR BAD FAITH by Southern Trust Insurance Company.(Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/5/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/5/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF CONSENT by Southern Trust Insurance Company (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Southern Trust Insurance Company. (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#2

(#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/5/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

7 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#11

(#11) CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Honorable Debra Poplin, USMJ. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/16/18. (ABF) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

9 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/17/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L. Reeves.Signed by District Judge Pamela L. Reeves on 10/1/18. (ADA) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Honorable Debra Poplin, USMJ. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/16/18. (ABF) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF CONSENT by Southern Trust Insurance Company (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/17/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L. Reeves.Signed by District Judge Pamela L. Reeves on 10/1/18. (ADA) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint ND CLAIM FOR BAD FAITH by Southern Trust Insurance Company.(Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Southern Trust Insurance Company. (Adkins, Terrill) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/5/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/5/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/5/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Southern Trust Insurance Company. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing Fee received, $400.00 Receipt #0649-3761908), filed by Southern Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Adkins, Terrill) Modified to add receipt # on 9/5/2018 (JBR). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.