This case was last updated from PACER on 09/03/2018 at 07:45:20 (UTC).

Bellamy v. Bruner

Case Summary

On 07/05/2018 Bellamy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Bruner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00206

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AshLynn Jo Bellamy

Andrew I Bellamy

Andrew I. Bellamy

Coffeyville, KS 67337

Defendant

Annie Lynn Bruner

Longtown, OK 74432

 

Court Documents

2 #7

Exhibit 7 - Notice filed with KS Court

2 #6

Exhibit 6 - Affidavit

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - Motion to Dismiss PO

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Temporary Order

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Order

2 #1

Exhibit 1- State Court Petition

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Montgomery County District Court - Kansas, case number 18-DM-64-C by Annie Lynn Bruner (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Annie Lynn Bruner (jcb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/9/2018 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/05/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/5/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 15476 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Annie Lynn Bruner (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Montgomery County District Court - Kansas, case number 18-DM-64-C by Annie Lynn Bruner (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Annie Lynn Bruner (jcb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/9/2018 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Annie Lynn Bruner by AshLynn Jo Bellamy, Andrew I Bellamy (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less