This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:58:23 (UTC).

Bell v. Metacraft

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Bell filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Metacraft. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00991

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trenton Bell

Lebanon, TN 37087

Defendant

Metacraft

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER: Plaintiff's federal claims against Metacraft have been dismissed. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for a fast and speedy trial (Doc. No. #15 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court dismissed Plaintiff's supplemental state law claims against Metacraft without prejudice in the event that Plaintiff desired to pursue legal claims against Metacraft in state court. (Doc. Nos. #12 and #13 ). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/28/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#16

(#16) Letter from Trenton Bell re Suit against Metacraft. (jm) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Fast and Speedy Trial filed by Trenton Bell. (jm) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#14

(#14) ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #13 Order. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (jm) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER: The Court has reviewed the complaint pursuant to the PLRA and, for the reasons set forth in the Memorandum entered contemporaneously with this Order, finds that the complaint fails to state Section 1983 claims upon which relief can be granted. Therefore, Plaintiff's Section 1983 claims against Defendant Metacraft are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's supplemental state law claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, should Plaintiff wish to pursue them in state court. This Order constitutes the final judgment in this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Application to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff nonetheless remains responsible for paying the full filing fee. Trenton Bell is hereby assessed the full $350 filing fee. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/9/2018. (xc:Pro se party and the administrator of inmate trust fund accounts at the Wilson County Jail by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/9/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#11

(#11) Letter regarding certified trust fund account from Trenton Bell. (jm) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#10

(#10) Letter from Trenton Bell requesting lawsuit packet and docket sheet. (Pro se party sent docket sheet by regular mail.) (jm) Modified on 10/31/2018 to remove lawsuit packet mailing. Lawsuit packet sent per DE 12 in case 3:18-0873. (jm). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted a letter to the Court, requesting a copy of the certified statement for him to complete. (Doc. No. 8). The Court construes this letter as a motion for clarification, which the Court GRANTS. There is no form for the Court to send to Plaintiff. The prisoner trust fund account statement submitted by Plaintiff on October 12, 2018, is the correct statement. (Doc. No. 6). The Clerk is DIRECTED to return the original of Doc. No. 6 to Plaintiff for his convenience. Before returning the statement to the Court, Plaintiff must ensure that the signature on the statement is the signature of the custodian of his inmate trust account and that the statement is certified as described above. Plaintiff has until November 30, 2018, to submit a certified statement. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this case will be dismissed.It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/29/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail w/ original DE 6 ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#8

(#8) Letter from Trenton Bell re trust fund account statement. (jm) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER: By Order entered on October 11, 2018, the Court notified Plaintiff that his application could not be processed because he had not submitted his certified trust fund account statement for the past six months as is required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). (Doc. No. #4 ). Plaintiff has since submitted a trust fund account statement (Doc. No. #6 ) but the statement is not certified. In addition, the signature is illegible, and it is unclear whether Plaintiff signed the statement himself. (Id. at 1). An extension of time to comply with this Order may be requested from this Court if a motion for an extension of time is filed within 28 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/18/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#6

(#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Trenton Bell. (jm) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing by Trenton Bell. (jm) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Doc. No. #2 ). Plaintiff's application cannot be processed at this time. Plaintiff has not submitted his certified trust fund account statement for the past six months. An extension of time to comply with this Order may be requested from this Court if a motion for an extension of time is filed within 28 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/11/18. (xc: Order and returned application to proceed in forma pauperis sent to Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Trenton Bell. (afs) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Metacraft, filed by Trenton Bell.(afs) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER: Plaintiff's federal claims against Metacraft have been dismissed. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for a fast and speedy trial (Doc. No. #15 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court dismissed Plaintiff's supplemental state law claims against Metacraft without prejudice in the event that Plaintiff desired to pursue legal claims against Metacraft in state court. (Doc. Nos. #12 and #13 ). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/28/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Letter from Trenton Bell re Suit against Metacraft. (jm) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Fast and Speedy Trial filed by Trenton Bell. (jm) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #13 Order. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (jm) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: The Court has reviewed the complaint pursuant to the PLRA and, for the reasons set forth in the Memorandum entered contemporaneously with this Order, finds that the complaint fails to state Section 1983 claims upon which relief can be granted. Therefore, Plaintiff's Section 1983 claims against Defendant Metacraft are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's supplemental state law claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, should Plaintiff wish to pursue them in state court. This Order constitutes the final judgment in this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Application to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff nonetheless remains responsible for paying the full filing fee. Trenton Bell is hereby assessed the full $350 filing fee. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/9/2018. (xc:Pro se party and the administrator of inmate trust fund accounts at the Wilson County Jail by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/9/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Letter regarding certified trust fund account from Trenton Bell. (jm) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from Trenton Bell requesting lawsuit packet and docket sheet. (Pro se party sent docket sheet by regular mail.) (jm) Modified on 10/31/2018 to remove lawsuit packet mailing. Lawsuit packet sent per DE 12 in case 3:18-0873. (jm). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted a letter to the Court, requesting a copy of the certified statement for him to complete. (Doc. No. 8). The Court construes this letter as a motion for clarification, which the Court GRANTS. There is no form for the Court to send to Plaintiff. The prisoner trust fund account statement submitted by Plaintiff on October 12, 2018, is the correct statement. (Doc. No. 6). The Clerk is DIRECTED to return the original of Doc. No. 6 to Plaintiff for his convenience. Before returning the statement to the Court, Plaintiff must ensure that the signature on the statement is the signature of the custodian of his inmate trust account and that the statement is certified as described above. Plaintiff has until November 30, 2018, to submit a certified statement. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this case will be dismissed.It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/29/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail w/ original DE 6 ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter from Trenton Bell re trust fund account statement. (jm) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: By Order entered on October 11, 2018, the Court notified Plaintiff that his application could not be processed because he had not submitted his certified trust fund account statement for the past six months as is required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). (Doc. No. #4 ). Plaintiff has since submitted a trust fund account statement (Doc. No. #6 ) but the statement is not certified. In addition, the signature is illegible, and it is unclear whether Plaintiff signed the statement himself. (Id. at 1). An extension of time to comply with this Order may be requested from this Court if a motion for an extension of time is filed within 28 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/18/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Trenton Bell. (jm) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Filing by Trenton Bell. (jm) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Doc. No. #2 ). Plaintiff's application cannot be processed at this time. Plaintiff has not submitted his certified trust fund account statement for the past six months. An extension of time to comply with this Order may be requested from this Court if a motion for an extension of time is filed within 28 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/11/18. (xc: Order and returned application to proceed in forma pauperis sent to Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included. (afs) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Trenton Bell. (afs) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Metacraft, filed by Trenton Bell.(afs) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.