This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2018 at 03:43:45 (UTC).

Bell et al v. Honeywell International Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 Bell filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Honeywell International Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin J. Garbis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00046

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marvin J. Garbis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Bell

Brenda Bell

Defendant

Honeywell International Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Armand Joseph Volta, III

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter G. Angelos P.C.

100 N. Charles Street

Baltimore City, MD 21201

Defendant Attorneys

Alicia N Ritchie

Attorney at Miles and Stockbridge PC

100 Light St

Baltimore, MD 21202

Jonathan James Huber

Attorney at Miles & Stockbridge P.C.

100 Light St

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 30 days as to Honeywell International Inc.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Honeywell International Inc., filed by Michael Bell, Brenda Bell.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24x17000539, filed by Honeywell International Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637103017) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#6

(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Honeywell International Inc. served on 12/19/2017, answer due 1/18/2018.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by Honeywell International Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by Honeywell International Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Honeywell International Inc. served on 12/19/2017, answer due 1/18/2018.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued 30 days as to Honeywell International Inc.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Honeywell International Inc., filed by Michael Bell, Brenda Bell.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24x17000539, filed by Honeywell International Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637103017) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.