This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2018 at 18:23:36 (UTC).

Belkin International, Inc. v. GZ Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2016 Belkin International, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against GZ Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alicia G. Rosenberg and Ronald S.W. Lew. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-06891

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

Presiding Judge

Ronald S.W. Lew

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Belkin International, Inc.

Defendants

Guohua Zhu

DOES

GZ Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Miles J Feldman

Attorney at Raines Fledman LLP

9720 Wilshire Boulevard 5Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Steven Thomas Gebelin

Attorney at Raines Feldman LLP

9720 Wilshire Boulevard Fifth Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorney

David Mark Rose

249 West Alder Street

Walla Walla, WA 99362

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/28/2016. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely p rosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff /s to show cause in writing no later than September 28, 2016, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a wr itten response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following, if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Defendant/s Answer/Response to the Complaint or Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default on defendant/s. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff/s is due. Plaintiff is to serve notice of this Order on all named parties in this action who have been served but have not yet appeared (excluding removing parties). Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action. (jre)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/28/2016. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely p rosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff /s to show cause in writing no later than September 28, 2016, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a wr itten response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following, if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Defendant/s Answer/Response to the Complaint or Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default on defendant/s. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff/s is due. Plaintiff is to serve notice of this Order on all named parties in this action who have been served but have not yet appeared (excluding removing parties). Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action. (jre)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELKIN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miles J Feldman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Thomas Gebelin