This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:53:24 (UTC).

Believe P. Kelson v. J. Gastelo et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Believe P Kelson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against J Gastelo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-08464

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Believe P. Kelson

San Luis Obispo, CA 93409-8101

Defendants

R. Hallet

Josie Gastelo

J. Poquette

J. Moody

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Mail Returned addressed to Believe P. Kelson re Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P) #6 . Envelope marked "Paroled/Discharged." (et) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Dismissing Action without prejudice. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (twdb) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#5

(#5) Mail Returned addressed to Believe P. Kelson re Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form #4 . Envelope marked "Paroled/Discharged." (ch) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Josie Gastelo(Warden, official capacity), Josie Gastelo(individual), R. Hallet(official capacity), R. Hallet(individual), J. Moody(individual), J. Moody(Case Records Analyst, official capacity), J. Poquette(individual), J. Poquette(Mental Health Supervisor, official capacity) pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L Abrams, filed by plaintiff Believe P. Kelson. (ghap) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#2) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Believe P. Kelson. (ghap) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice of Deficiency. On 10/1/2018, the Court received, through the United States Mail, a complaint arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Please be advised that the Court and California Men's Colony (CMC) are participants in a pilot project that requires all such documents to be scanned and submitted to the Court by electronic mail, General Order No. 18-02. Submission of this complaint by U.S. Mail violates the terms of General Order 18-02. To submit a complaint arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983 to the Court for filing, you must present it to designated CMC staff for scanning and emailing to the Court. If you are unable to comply with these procedures, you must submit with your complaint a motion for leave to file your documents by U.S. Mail that demonstrates good cause for your inability to submit your documents to the Court electronically. You must now re-submit your complaint to the Court electronically. You must submit for scanning an exact copy of the complaint you previously mailed to the Court; it cannot be modified in any way. You must include this notice on top of the complaint submitted for scanning. If your complaint is received in the Court's electronic mail box within two weeks from the date of this letter, your complaint will be deemed filed as of the date that appears on the envelope you originally sent via U.S. Mail. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (ghap) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned addressed to Believe P. Kelson re Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P) #6 . Envelope marked "Paroled/Discharged." (et) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Dismissing Action without prejudice. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (twdb) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Mail Returned addressed to Believe P. Kelson re Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form #4 . Envelope marked "Paroled/Discharged." (ch) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #2 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(ch) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Deficiency. On 10/1/2018, the Court received, through the United States Mail, a complaint arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Please be advised that the Court and California Men's Colony (CMC) are participants in a pilot project that requires all such documents to be scanned and submitted to the Court by electronic mail, General Order No. 18-02. Submission of this complaint by U.S. Mail violates the terms of General Order 18-02. To submit a complaint arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983 to the Court for filing, you must present it to designated CMC staff for scanning and emailing to the Court. If you are unable to comply with these procedures, you must submit with your complaint a motion for leave to file your documents by U.S. Mail that demonstrates good cause for your inability to submit your documents to the Court electronically. You must now re-submit your complaint to the Court electronically. You must submit for scanning an exact copy of the complaint you previously mailed to the Court; it cannot be modified in any way. You must include this notice on top of the complaint submitted for scanning. If your complaint is received in the Court's electronic mail box within two weeks from the date of this letter, your complaint will be deemed filed as of the date that appears on the envelope you originally sent via U.S. Mail. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (ghap) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Believe P. Kelson. (ghap) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Josie Gastelo(Warden, official capacity), Josie Gastelo(individual), R. Hallet(official capacity), R. Hallet(individual), J. Moody(individual), J. Moody(Case Records Analyst, official capacity), J. Poquette(individual), J. Poquette(Mental Health Supervisor, official capacity) pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L Abrams, filed by plaintiff Believe P. Kelson. (ghap) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.