This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2018 at 07:14:02 (UTC).

Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd. v. Pinduoduo Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Pinduoduo Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Naomi Reice Buchwald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-06504

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Naomi Reice Buchwald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.

Defendants

Hangzhou Weimi Network Technology Co., Ltd.

Hongkong Walnut Street Limited

John Doe Sellers 1-3

Shenzhen Qianhai Xinzhijiang Information Technology Co., Ltd.

Pinduoduo Inc.

Hangzhou Aimi Network Technology Co., Ltd.

Shanghai Xunmeng Information Technology Co., Ltd.

Shanghai Pinduoduo Network Technology Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Michael Griem

Attorney at Carter Ledyard & Milburn, LLP (NYC)

2 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

Madelyn Kempner White

Attorney at Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP

2 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

Jeffrey S. Boxer

Attorney at Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP

2 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Joseph Dreyer

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate,Meagher & Flom LLP(IIA)

Four Times Sq.,

New York, NY 10036

Hannah Murray Marek

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP (NYC)

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Jordan Adam Feirman

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP (NYC)

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Copy of A screen shot showing goods offered for sale on Pinduoduo in

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Copy of Screen shots showing unauthorized or counterfeit DADDYS CHOI

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Copy of Certificate confirming that Daddys Choice diapers comply wit

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Copies of the Registration Certificates

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hangzhou Aimi Network Technology Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 7/31/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Hangzhou Weimi Network Technology Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 7/31/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Hongkong Walnut Street Limited waiver sent on 7/31/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Pinduoduo Inc. waiver sent on 7/31/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Shanghai Pinduoduo Network Technology Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 7/31/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Shanghai Xunmeng Information Technology Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 7/31/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Shenzhen Qianhai Xinzhijiang Information Technology Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 7/31/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Document filed by Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.. (Griem, John) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent, Other Affiliate Tencent Holdings Limited for Pinduoduo Inc.; Corporate Parent Hongkong Walnut Street Limited, Other Affiliate People's Republic of China (PRC) for Hangzhou Weimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Pinduoduo Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Qianhai Xinzhijiang Information Technology Co., Ltd.; Corporate Parent Pinduoduo Inc. for Hongkong Walnut Street Limited; Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent, Other Affiliate People's Republic of China (PRC) for Hangzhou Aimi Network Technology Co., Ltd.; Corporate Parent Hangzhou Aimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate People's Republic of China (PRC) for Shanghai Xunmeng Information Technology Co., Ltd.. Document filed by Hangzhou Aimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Weimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Hongkong Walnut Street Limited, Pinduoduo Inc., Shanghai Pinduoduo Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Xunmeng Information Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Qianhai Xinzhijiang Information Technology Co., Ltd..(Dreyer, Anthony) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hannah Murray Marek on behalf of Hangzhou Aimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Weimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Hongkong Walnut Street Limited, Pinduoduo Inc., Shanghai Pinduoduo Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Xunmeng Information Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Qianhai Xinzhijiang Information Technology Co., Ltd.. (Marek, Hannah) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Adam Feirman on behalf of Hangzhou Aimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Weimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Hongkong Walnut Street Limited, Pinduoduo Inc., Shanghai Pinduoduo Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Xunmeng Information Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Qianhai Xinzhijiang Information Technology Co., Ltd.. (Feirman, Jordan) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Joseph Dreyer on behalf of Hangzhou Aimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Weimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Hongkong Walnut Street Limited, Pinduoduo Inc., Shanghai Pinduoduo Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Xunmeng Information Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Qianhai Xinzhijiang Information Technology Co., Ltd.. (Dreyer, Anthony) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Madelyn Kempner White on behalf of Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.. (White, Madelyn) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey S. Boxer on behalf of Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.. (Boxer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jgo) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shenzhen Qianhai Xinzhijiang Information Technology Co., Ltd.. (jgo) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shanghai Xunmeng Information Technology Co., Ltd.. (jgo) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shanghai Xunmeng Information Technology Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.. (Griem, John) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hangzhou Aimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.. (Griem, John) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shenzen Qianhai Xinzhijian Information Technology Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.. (Griem, John) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shanghai Pinduoduo Network Technology Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.. (Griem, John) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hangzhou Weimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.. (Griem, John) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HongKong Walnut Street Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.. (Griem, John) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pinduoduo Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.. (Griem, John) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd..(Griem, John) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Griem, John) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe Sellers 1-3, Hangzhou Aimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Weimi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Hongkong Walnut Street Limited, Pinduoduo Inc., Shanghai Pinduoduo Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Xunmeng Information Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Qianhai Xinzhijiang Information Technology Co., Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15341915)Document filed by Beijing Daddy's Choice Science and Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Copies of the Registration Certificates, #2 Exhibit 2 - Copy of Certificate confirming that Daddys Choice diapers comply with the U.S. Consumer Product Safety Improvement Act of 2008, #3 Exhibit 3 - Copy of Screen shots showing unauthorized or counterfeit DADDYS CHOICE products available for sale on Pinduoduo, #4 Exhibit 4 - Copy of A screen shot showing goods offered for sale on Pinduoduo in substantially similar packaging and falsely touted as being made in the same factory)(Griem, John) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINDUODUO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Michael Griem