This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2018 at 07:50:21 (UTC).

Begley v. Glass Family Pizza et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 Begley filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Glass Family Pizza. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Candace J. Smith and David L. Bunning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00124

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Begley

Defendants

John Glass

Glass Family Pizza

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David O'Brien Suetholz

Attorney at Kircher, Suetholz & Grayson, PSC - Louisville

515 Park Avenue

Louisville, KY 40208

J. Forester

Attorney at Forester Haynie PLLC

1701 N. Market Street, Suite 210

Dallas, TX 75202

J. Gerard Stranch, IV

Attorney at Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings, PLLC

223 Rosa L. Parks Avenue, Suite 200

Nashville, TN 37203

Matthew Haynie

Attorney at Forester Haynie PLLC

1701 N. Market Street, Suite 210

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorney

Todd B. Logsdon

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips - Louisville

220 W. Main Street, Suite 1700

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 01/13/2011.(KRB)cc: COR (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to John Glass, Glass Family Pizza; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KRB) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

8 #1

Atty Admission Info and Routing Form - No record of Admission

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4122284), filed by Paul Begley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. Notice of Consent, #3 Summons Cincy Dominos, #4 Summons John Glass)(KRB) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

1 #3

Summons Cincy Dominos

1 #4

Summons John Glass

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY J. Forester by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Atty Admission Info and Routing Form - No record of Admission)(ECO) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Begley via Certified Mail - Return Receipt to Glass Family Pizza served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Suetholz, David) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#6

(#6) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond by John Glass, Glass Family Pizza. (Logsdon, Todd) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

9 #1

Atty Admission Info and Routing Form-No record of Admission

1 #2

Exhibit A. Notice of Consent

#7

(#7) AGREED ORDER Extending the Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint: that Defendants, Glass Family Pizza d/b/a Cincy Dominos, LLC and John Glass shall be granted an extension of time, up to and including October 3, 2018 in which to file an initial response or Answer to Plaintiff, Paul Begley's, Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/10/2018.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Matthew Haynie by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Atty Admission Info and Routing Form-No record of Admission)(ECO) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Matthew Haynie by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Atty Admission Info and Routing Form-No record of Admission)(ECO) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY J. Forester by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Atty Admission Info and Routing Form - No record of Admission)(ECO) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AGREED ORDER Extending the Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint: that Defendants, Glass Family Pizza d/b/a Cincy Dominos, LLC and John Glass shall be granted an extension of time, up to and including October 3, 2018 in which to file an initial response or Answer to Plaintiff, Paul Begley's, Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/10/2018.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: #6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond by John Glass, Glass Family Pizza (KRB) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond by John Glass, Glass Family Pizza. (Logsdon, Todd) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Begley via Certified Mail - Return Receipt to Glass Family Pizza served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Suetholz, David) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (KRB) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to John Glass, Glass Family Pizza; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KRB) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 01/13/2011.(KRB)cc: COR (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4122284), filed by Paul Begley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. Notice of Consent, #3 Summons Cincy Dominos, #4 Summons John Glass)(KRB) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.