This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2018 at 07:08:55 (UTC).

Beeler v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 Beeler filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00109

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harvey Beeler

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randi Alyson Kassan

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Timothy Michael Clark

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

2860 Michelle Drive, Suite 220

Irvine, CA 92807

Defendant Attorneys

Chelsea R. Kurth

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP - IN

One American Square, Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282-0200

Amy K. Fisher

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP - IN

One American Square, Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282-0200

Katherine D. Althoff

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP - IN

One American Square, Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282-0200

 

Court Documents

20 #1

*Restricted*

#20

(#20) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Southern. Case number 4:17-cv-00207. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered attorneys (Entered: 02/16/2018)

#19

(#19) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Eastern District of Kentucky. Case transferred electronically to Eastern District of Kentucky, IN RE: MDL 2809 on February 15, 2018. (MAC) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/15/2018)

#18

(#18) CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. IN RE: ONGLYZA (SAXAGLIPTIN) AND KOMBIGLYZE XR (SAXAGLIPTIN AND METFORMIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2809 per Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (MAC) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/15/2018)

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #224, United States Courthouse, 121 W. Spring Street, New Albany, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/5/2018. (MAT) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)

#16

(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Kurth, Chelsea) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION.(Kurth, Chelsea) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP identifying Corporate Parent ASTRAZENECA PLC for ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP.. (Kurth, Chelsea) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP.(Kurth, Chelsea) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service, filed by HARVEY BEELER. MCKESSON CORPORATION served on 11/10/2017. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by HARVEY BEELER. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY served on 11/15/2017. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/21/2017)

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service, filed by HARVEY BEELER. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP served on 11/10/2017. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2017)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Kassan on behalf of Plaintiff HARVEY BEELER. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION. (MAT) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP.(Kurth, Chelsea) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (CBD) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Southern. Case number 4:17-cv-00207. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered attorneys (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Eastern District of Kentucky. Case transferred electronically to Eastern District of Kentucky, IN RE: MDL 2809 on February 15, 2018. (MAC) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. IN RE: ONGLYZA (SAXAGLIPTIN) AND KOMBIGLYZE XR (SAXAGLIPTIN AND METFORMIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2809 per Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (MAC) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #224, United States Courthouse, 121 W. Spring Street, New Albany, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/5/2018. (MAT) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Kurth, Chelsea) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION.(Kurth, Chelsea) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP identifying Corporate Parent ASTRAZENECA PLC for ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP.. (Kurth, Chelsea) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP.(Kurth, Chelsea) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea R. Kurth on behalf of Defendants ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Kurth, Chelsea) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine D. Althoff on behalf of Defendants ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Althoff, Katherine) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy K. Fisher on behalf of Defendants ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Fisher, Amy) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN of Service, filed by HARVEY BEELER. MCKESSON CORPORATION served on 11/10/2017. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN of Service, filed by HARVEY BEELER. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY served on 11/15/2017. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN of Service, filed by HARVEY BEELER. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP served on 11/10/2017. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Kassan on behalf of Plaintiff HARVEY BEELER. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, LP, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION. (MAT) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Harvey Beeler, filed by Harvey Beeler. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4616869) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from insd on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less