This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2018 at 05:55:16 (UTC).

Beckel v. Dimas et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 Beckel filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Dimas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colin Stirling Bruce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04027

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Beckel

Rushville, IL 62681

Defendants

. Simkis

C Parsons

Gregg Scott

Krista Wilcoxen

Lynn Shelton

B Mayers

Sharlene Caraway

Sharon Coleman

Lisa Steffon

S Dredge

Sandra Simpson

. Moore

. Jones

M Sheldon

James Dimas

T Little

Eric Kunkel

. Woods

P Vincent

2 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 3/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

1 #5

Scanning Cover Sheets

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against. Berry, Sharlene Caraway, Sharon Coleman, James Dimas, S Dredge,. Jones, S Jumper, Eric Kunkel, T Little, B Mayers,. Moore, C Parsons, Gregg Scott, M Sheldon, Lynn Shelton,. Simkis, Sandra Simpson, Lisa Steffon, P Vincent, Krista Wilcoxen,. Woods, filed by Andrew Beckel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Scanning Cover Sheets)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2018
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/14/2018. Plaintiff has not filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis nor paid the $400 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to mail to the plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days, plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with account statements for the previous six months, or his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. (Miscellaneous Deadline 3/14/2018) (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 3/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against. Berry, Sharlene Caraway, Sharon Coleman, James Dimas, S Dredge,. Jones, S Jumper, Eric Kunkel, T Little, B Mayers,. Moore, C Parsons, Gregg Scott, M Sheldon, Lynn Shelton,. Simkis, Sandra Simpson, Lisa Steffon, P Vincent, Krista Wilcoxen,. Woods, filed by Andrew Beckel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Scanning Cover Sheets)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less