This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2019 at 08:07:37 (UTC).

Beaver v. Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 Beaver filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00659

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane A Beaver

Defendant

Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Brice

Attorney at Decof, Barry, Mega & Quinn, P.C.

One Smith Hill

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorneys

Brenna Anatone Force

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

One Citizens Plaza, 8Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Geoffrey W. Millsom

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.

One Citizens Plaza, 8Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to be completed by 6/28/2019; Party with the burden of proof Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/29/2019; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures shall be made by 8/29/2019; All Expert Discovery to be completed by 10/28/2019; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 11/29/2019; Pretrial Memorandum due 30 days after decision on any pending motion, or if no motions are pending, by 12/13/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/14/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Diane A Beaver Notice of Change of Firm Name (Brice, Mark) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC.(Millsom, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#5

(#5) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#4

(#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey W. Millsom on behalf of Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC (Millsom, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC. (Force, Brenna) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

1 #4

Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-8098. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1296653, filed by Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court)(Force, Brenna) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • NOTICE of Hearing: Status and Scheduling Conference set for Monday 6/3/2019 at 9:30 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to be completed by 6/28/2019; Party with the burden of proof Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/29/2019; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures shall be made by 8/29/2019; All Expert Discovery to be completed by 10/28/2019; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 11/29/2019; Pretrial Memorandum due 30 days after decision on any pending motion, or if no motions are pending, by 12/13/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/14/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Diane A Beaver Notice of Change of Firm Name (Brice, Mark) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC.(Millsom, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey W. Millsom on behalf of Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC (Millsom, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC. (Force, Brenna) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-8098. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1296653, filed by Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court)(Force, Brenna) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey W. Millsom on behalf of Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC (Millsom, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC. (Force, Brenna) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-8098. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1296653, filed by Honeysuckle Lodge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court)(Force, Brenna) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less