This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:48 (UTC).

Beasley v. Ryan et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Beasley filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Ryan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are G Murray Snow, Michelle H Burns (PS), Raner C Collins and D Thomas Ferraro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02680

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

G Murray Snow

Raner C Collins

Referral Judges

Michelle H Burns (PS)

D Thomas Ferraro

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Telly Onturio Beasley

Phoenix, AZ 85040

Defendants

Charles Ryan

Attorney General of the State of Arizona

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Eric Karl Knobloch

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Phoenix

2005 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1592

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (BAS) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

2 #1

2nd part memorandum

2 #6

exh part 5

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number PHX199941 filed by Telly Onturio Beasley. (24 pages no envelope)(BAS) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

4 #1

Petition

2 #3

exh part 2

#7

(#7) *NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Karl Knobloch on behalf of Charles Ryan, Attorney General of the State of Arizona. (Knobloch, Eric) *Modified to add filer on 10/17/2018 (EJA). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

2 #2

exh part 1

2 #5

exh part 4

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Petitioner Telly Onturio Beasley. (Attachments: #1 2nd part memorandum, #2 exh part 1, #3 exh part 2, #4 exh part 3, #5 exh part 4, #6 exh part 5, #7 exh part 6, #8 exh part 7) (410 pages total)(BAS) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

2 #4

exh part 3

#4

(#4) Arizona Attorney General Service Order (2254)- The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the #1 Petition and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by certified mail pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/10/18. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(MSA) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

2 #7

exh part 6

2 #8

exh part 7

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) *NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Karl Knobloch on behalf of Charles Ryan, Attorney General of the State of Arizona. (Knobloch, Eric) *Modified to add filer on 10/17/2018 (EJA). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Raner C Collins and Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-2680-PHX-RCC (DTF). All deadlines and hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • (#5) Notice of Receipt of Electronic Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arizona Attorney General on 10/10/18. The Attorney General's Office will file a Notice of Appearance within five (5) business days that identifies the respondents that are represented or, in the alternative, will notify the Court if the Attorney General is not able to accept service for and/or represent any of the named respondents. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Sparks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Arizona Attorney General Service Order (2254)- The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the #1 Petition and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by certified mail pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/10/18. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(MSA) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (BAS) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Petitioner Telly Onturio Beasley. (Attachments: #1 2nd part memorandum, #2 exh part 1, #3 exh part 2, #4 exh part 3, #5 exh part 4, #6 exh part 5, #7 exh part 6, #8 exh part 7) (410 pages total)(BAS) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number PHX199941 filed by Telly Onturio Beasley. (24 pages no envelope)(BAS) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less