This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2019 at 07:01:14 (UTC).

Beasley v. Lucky Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Beasley filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Lucky Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-07144

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Beasley

Defendants

Nestle USA, Inc.

Save Mart Super Markets

The Save Mart Companies, Inc.

The Kroger Company

Lucky Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Christopher Hamilton

Attorney at The Weston Firm

1405 Morena Blvd., Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

Gregory Weston

1405 Morena Blvd, Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

Defendant Attorneys

Keri Elizabeth Borders

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Dale Joseph Giali

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1503

 

Court Documents

30 #4

Proposed Order

30 #3

Declaration of Steve Gaines

30 #2

Declaration of Daniel Nugent

30 #1

Appendix A to Opposition

#30

(#30) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 MOTION to Remand ) filed byLucky Stores, Inc., Nestle USA, Inc., Save Mart Super Markets, The Kroger Company, The Save Mart Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Opposition, #2 Declaration of Daniel Nugent, #3 Declaration of Steve Gaines, #4 Proposed Order)(Giali, Dale) (Filed on 1/16/2019) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

29 #1

Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice

#29

(#29) Request for Judicial Notice re #28 MOTION to Remand filed byMark Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

28 #1

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand

#28

(#28) MOTION to Remand filed by Mark Beasley. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 1/16/2019. Replies due by 1/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

1 #9

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Declaration of Dale J. Giali

#1

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Nestle USA, Inc. re: #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Giali, Dale) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 MOTION to Remand ) filed byLucky Stores, Inc., Nestle USA, Inc., Save Mart Super Markets, The Kroger Company, The Save Mart Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Opposition, #2 Declaration of Daniel Nugent, #3 Declaration of Steve Gaines, #4 Proposed Order)(Giali, Dale) (Filed on 1/16/2019) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Request for Judicial Notice re #28 MOTION to Remand filed byMark Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION to Remand filed by Mark Beasley. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 1/16/2019. Replies due by 1/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND DEFENDANT NESTLE USA, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 21, 2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Case Reassigned to Judge Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on December 21, 2018. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/20/18. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Mark Beasley. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #22 Stipulation 1. Extending Time To Respond To First Amended Complaint; and 2. Setting Briefing Schedule On Anticipated Motion To Reman. Responses due by 1/16/2019 and Replies due by 1/30/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER 1. Extending Time To Respond To First Amended Complaint; and 2. Setting Briefing Schedule On Anticipated Motion To Remand Nestle USA, Inc., Save Mart Super Markets, The Kroger Company, and Mark Beasley (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dale J. Giali)(Giali, Dale) (Filed on 12/17/2018) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:18-cv-07144-HSG. Re: #21 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Mark Beasley (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Beasley.. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 11/27/2018) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Christopher Hamilton (Hamilton, Andrew) (Filed on 11/27/2018) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Weston (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 11/27/2018) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nestle USA, Inc. re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Giali, Dale) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Nestle USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nestle S.A., Corporate Parent Nestle Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent NIMCO US, Inc. for Nestle USA, Inc.. (Giali, Dale) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Nestle USA, Inc. re: #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Giali, Dale) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Keri Elizabeth Borders (Borders, Keri) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to Judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used when filing initial documents of (JS-CAND 44 (Rev 08/18). Please compl ete current Civil Cover Sheet of JS-CAND-44 (Rev. 06/17) and re-file as separate docket entry re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Nestle USA, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/10/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-18-570953. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12872248). Filed byNestle USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dale J. Giali, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Giali, Dale) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NESTLE USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE SAVE MART COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where LUCKY STORES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS is a litigant