This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2019 at 07:00:29 (UTC).

Beasley v. Conagra Brands, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 Beasley filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Conagra Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Susan Illston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-06730

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Beasley

Defendant

Conagra Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Christopher Hamilton

Attorney at The Weston Firm

1405 Morena Blvd., Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

Gregory Weston

1405 Morena Blvd, Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel Elizabeth King Lowe

Attorney at Alston & Bird

333 S. Hope Street, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6022

Angela M Spivey

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street, One Atlantic Center

Atlanta, GA 30309

Andrew G Phillips

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street, Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309-3534

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss , or, Alternatively, Stay Complaint ) OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND NOTICE OF ELECTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed byMark Beasley. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 1/4/2019) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#19

(#19) Certificate of Interested Entities by Conagra Brands, Inc. (Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

18 #6

Proposed Order

18 #5

Request for Judicial Notice

18 #4

Exhibit C in Support of Declaration of Lara Tumeh

18 #3

Exhibit B in Support of Declaration of Lara Tumeh

18 #2

Exhibit A in Support of Declaration of Lara Tumeh

18 #1

Declaration of Lara Tumeh

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss , or, Alternatively, Stay Complaint filed by Conagra Brands, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/4/2019. Replies due by 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lara Tumeh, #2 Exhibit A in Support of Declaration of Lara Tumeh, #3 Exhibit B in Support of Declaration of Lara Tumeh, #4 Exhibit C in Support of Declaration of Lara Tumeh, #5 Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Proposed Order)(Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

(#8) ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/9/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Conagra Brands, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#3

(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Beasley.. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 11/6/2018) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Christopher Hamilton (Hamilton, Andrew) (Filed on 11/6/2018) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#12) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Conagra Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 11/20/2018) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss , or, Alternatively, Stay Complaint ) OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND NOTICE OF ELECTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed byMark Beasley. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 1/4/2019) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Certificate of Interested Entities by Conagra Brands, Inc. (Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Dismiss , or, Alternatively, Stay Complaint filed by Conagra Brands, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/4/2019. Replies due by 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lara Tumeh, #2 Exhibit A in Support of Declaration of Lara Tumeh, #3 Exhibit B in Support of Declaration of Lara Tumeh, #4 Exhibit C in Support of Declaration of Lara Tumeh, #5 Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Proposed Order)(Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew G. Phillips ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12925600.) filed by Conagra Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Georgia)(Phillips, Andrew) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Angela M. Spivey ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12925457.) filed by Conagra Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing - Georgia and Mississippi)(Spivey, Angela) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Conagra Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 11/20/2018) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Beasley. Conagra Brands, Inc. served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark Beasley (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/9/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Conagra Brands, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/20/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Beasley.. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 11/6/2018) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Christopher Hamilton (Hamilton, Andrew) (Filed on 11/6/2018) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Conagra Brands, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12825301.). Filed byMark Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 11/6/2018) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conagra Foods Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Christopher Hamilton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Weston