This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 21:54:32 (UTC).

Beachfunds Patents LLC et al v. H.H. & A. Sports, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 Beachfunds Patents LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against H H A Sports, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00236

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Beachfunds Patents LLC

Lasermarx, Inc.

Lasermarx, Inc. doing business as Quality Archery Designs

Defendants and Counter Claimants

H.H. & A. Sports, Inc.

H.H. & A. Sports, Inc. doing business as HHA Sports

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Michael A. Oropallo

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

125 E. Jefferson Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

Jeffrey Adam Mandell

Attorney at Stafford Rosenbaum LLP

P.O. Box 1784, 222 W Washington Ave, 900

Madison, WI 53701

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Patrick Cooney

1 E Main St, Ste 500

Madison, WI 53703

Jennifer Lynn Gregor

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn S.C.

One East Main Street, Suite 500, P.O. Box 2719

Madison, WI 53701-2719

Shane Michael Delsman

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn

833 East Michigan Street

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Defendant H.H & A. Sports, Inc. (Cooney, Patrick) Modified on 5/31/2018. (lak) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Cooney for Defendant H.H. & A. Sports, Inc. (Cooney, Patrick) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Shane Michael Delsman for Defendant H.H. & A. Sports, Inc. (Delsman, Shane) (Entered: 05/08/2018)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer Lynn Gregor for Defendant H.H. & A. Sports, Inc. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Stipulation to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Plaintiffs Beachfunds Patents LLC, Lasermarx, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mandell, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/7/2018. (lak) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

#3

(#3) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jat) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to H.H. & A. Sports, Inc. (jat) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

1 #4

Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action Report on Patent Filing

1 #3

Summons Summons

1 #2

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,789,536

#1

(#1) PATENT COMPLAINT against H.H. & A. Sports, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2222962.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 6,789,536, issued 09/14/04, held by Beachfunds Patents LLC, filed by Beachfunds Patents LLC, Lasermarx, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,789,536, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Mandell, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/6/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketSet Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/5/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Defendant H.H & A. Sports, Inc. (Cooney, Patrick) Modified on 5/31/2018. (lak) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Cooney for Defendant H.H. & A. Sports, Inc. (Cooney, Patrick) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Shane Michael Delsman for Defendant H.H. & A. Sports, Inc. (Delsman, Shane) (Entered: 05/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: H.H. & A. Sports, Inc. answer due 5/31/2018. (jat) (Entered: 05/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #4 Stipulation to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/8/18. (jat) (Entered: 05/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer Lynn Gregor for Defendant H.H. & A. Sports, Inc. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Stipulation to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Plaintiffs Beachfunds Patents LLC, Lasermarx, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mandell, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/7/2018. (lak) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jat) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to H.H. & A. Sports, Inc. (jat) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PATENT COMPLAINT against H.H. & A. Sports, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2222962.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 6,789,536, issued 09/14/04, held by Beachfunds Patents LLC, filed by Beachfunds Patents LLC, Lasermarx, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,789,536, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Mandell, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/6/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less