This case was last updated from PACER on 10/14/2018 at 07:26:47 (UTC).

Baxter et al v. Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 Baxter filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are William G. Cobb, Larry R. Hicks and Carla Baldwin Carry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00388

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Larry R. Hicks

Referral Judges

William G. Cobb

Carla Baldwin Carry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ellie Baxter

Thomas Baxter

Thomas Baxter, Jr.

Defendant

Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clayton P Brust

Attorney at Robison Sharp Sullivan & Brust

71 Washington St

Reno, NV 89503

Therese M. Shanks

Attorney at Robison Sharp Sulliven & Brust

71 Washington Street

Reno, NV 89503

Defendant Attorneys

Steven E. Guinn

Attorney at Laxalt & Nomura, Ltd

9790 Gateway Dr, Suite 200

Reno, NV 89521

Ryan William Leary

Attorney at Laxalt & Nomura, Ltd.

9790 Gateway Drive, Ste. 200

Reno, NV 89521

Kurt R. Bonds

Attorney at ALVERSON TAYLOR & SANDERS

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Alexander Williams

Attorney at ALVERSON TAYLOR & SANDERS

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alexander Williams on behalf of Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Williams, Alexander) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Kurt R. Bonds on behalf of Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Bonds, Kurt) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#16

(#16) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 9/18/2018. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 10/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Wednesday, September 26, 2018. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#15

(#15) Joint STIPULATION re Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Thomas Baxter. (Brust, Clayton) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#14

(#14) Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#11

(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Following Removal by Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/24/2018. Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 1:30 P.M. in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically shall dial 1-877-873-8017, enter the access code 3416460, and enter the security code 91718 approximately (5) minutes prior to the hearing. The parties shall jointly file the case management report with the Clerk of the Court not less than (7) court days before the case management conference. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#9

(#9) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Wrongful Death filed by Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/6/2018.(Guinn, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Thomas Baxter. (Brust, Clayton) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#4

(#4) ERRATA to #2 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/16/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/31/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#4) ERRATA to #2 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal by Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alexander Williams on behalf of Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Williams, Alexander) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Kurt R. Bonds on behalf of Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Bonds, Kurt) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 9/25/2018. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. In light of a conflict with the Court's calendar, the case management conference currently set for 10/5/2018 shall commence at 1:30 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry instead of 10:30 AM as originally scheduled. All other aspects of this Court's order scheduling case management conference (ECF No. #16 ) shall remain in full effect. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 9/18/2018. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 10/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Wednesday, September 26, 2018. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Joint STIPULATION re Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Thomas Baxter. (Brust, Clayton) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/5/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Ogden. In view of the 12 Clerk's Office Notice reassigning the case to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry, the #10 Case Management Conference scheduled for Monday, 9/17/2018, at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Cobb is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • (#12) CLERK'S NOTICE - Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:18-cv-00388-LRH-CBC. (no image attached) (DRM) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Following Removal by Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/24/2018. Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 1:30 P.M. in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically shall dial 1-877-873-8017, enter the access code 3416460, and enter the security code 91718 approximately (5) minutes prior to the hearing. The parties shall jointly file the case management report with the Clerk of the Court not less than (7) court days before the case management conference. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Wrongful Death filed by Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/6/2018.(Guinn, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Thomas Baxter. (Brust, Clayton) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ERRATA to #2 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/16/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/31/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV18-01483, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5198978) by Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guinn, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal by Lake Michigan Distilling Company, LLC. (Guinn, Steven) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.