This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/24/2020 at 06:18:58 (UTC).

Baumann v. PNC Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2018 Baumann filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against PNC Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas B. Smith, Paul G. Byron and Karla R. Spaulding. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01758

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

Referral Judges

Thomas B. Smith

Karla R. Spaulding

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James E. Baumann

Deltona, FL 32725

Defendants

McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

PNC Bank, N.A.

Shapiro, Fishman, & Gache, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Andrew Apatov

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

1 E Broward Blvd Ste 1400

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301-1834

Ileen Jill Cantor

Attorney at Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP

Suite 360, 2424 N Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) ORDER denying as moot #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/20/2019. (ECJ) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal without prejudice by James E. Baumann (RDO) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#35

(#35) Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to #21 Motion to Dismiss by McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC, PNC Bank, N.A.. (Apatov, Joseph) Modified on 2/13/2019 (RDO). (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#24

(#38) ORDER denying as moot #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/20/2019. (ECJ) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

21 #4

Exhibit D - Order Granting Prospective Relief From Stay

21 #3

Exhibit C - Motion for Reconsideration

21 #2

Exhibit B - Order Granting Motion for Sanctions

21 #1

Exhibit A - Motion for Sanctions

#21

(#35) Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to #21 Motion to Dismiss by McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC, PNC Bank, N.A.. (Apatov, Joseph) Modified on 2/13/2019 (RDO). (Entered: 02/12/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by James E. Baumann. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by James E. Baumann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(RDO) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER denying as moot #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/20/2019. (ECJ) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal without prejudice by James E. Baumann (RDO) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Amend. Defendants PNC Bank, N.A., and McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC, may file a reply brief, not to exceed five (5) pages, on or before March 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/13/2019. (ECJ) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to #21 Motion to Dismiss by McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC, PNC Bank, N.A.. (Apatov, Joseph) Modified on 2/13/2019 (RDO). (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/12/2019. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER to Strike re: #32 Initial Disclosures filed by Shapiro, Fishman, & Gache, LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/6/2019. (ECJ) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) (STRICKEN BY #33 ORDER) Initial Disclosures by Shapiro, Fishman, & Gache, LLP. (Cantor, Ileen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 2/6/2019 (RDO). Modified on 2/7/2019 (RDO). (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Docket(#31) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Terry White appointed as mediator. (RDO) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketSet/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2019, Discovery due by 10/14/2019, Dispositive motions due by 11/12/2019, Pretrial statement due by 2/18/2020, All other motions due by 2/25/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for trial term beginning on 4/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 10/21/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/19/2019, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/15/2019 (RDO) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/1/2019. (MMW) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by James E. Baumann. (RDO) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/29/2018. (GNB) copies mailed (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/29/2018. (GNB) copies mailed (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by James E. Baumann. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by James E. Baumann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(RDO) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • (#5) Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. New case number: 6:18-cv-1758-Orl-40KRS. (GJS) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER of recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/19/2018. (PML) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Set/reset deadline: Amended Complaint due by 11/1/2018 (JET) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER dismissing without prejudice #1 Complaint as a shotgun pleading. On or before November 1, 2018, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to file an amended complaint within the time provided will result in the Court dismissing this case and closing the file without further notice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/18/2018. (SCM) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (issued at intake) (RDO) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL077792. Filed by James E. Baumann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(no civil cover sheet received with Complaint)(RDO) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ileen Jill Cantor