This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2019 at 07:52:07 (UTC).

Battley, et al v. Doiron et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 Battley filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Doiron. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01014

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shervisa Sullivan Battley

Defendants

The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company

Leena Doiron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Holloway, Sr

Attorney at Jonathan Holloway PLC

8550 United Plaza Blvd., Suite 702

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Ricardo A. Caballero

Attorney at Caballero Fields & Adams

13862 Perkins Road

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Defendant Attorneys

Covert J. Geary

Attorney at Jones Walker LLP

201 St. Charles Ave., 50Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Christopher Kirt Ulfers

Attorney at Jones Walker, LLP

201 St. Charles Ave, 48Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Reagan Reynolds Wilty

Attorney at Leake & Andersson LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163

George Davidson Fagan

Attorney at Leake & Andersson LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

List of Exhibits

1 #7

Consent to Removal

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#13) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Leena Doiron. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Wilty, Reagan) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Settlement by Shervisa Sullivan Battley (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Caballero, Ricardo) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

16 #1

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Leena Doiron. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Wilty, Reagan) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

13 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint for Damages by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Ulfers, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Enroll Reagan R Wilty as Additional Attorney by Leena Doiron. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Fagan, George) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

10 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • (#17) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/09/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Settlement by Shervisa Sullivan Battley (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Caballero, Ricardo) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • (#15) Notice to Counsel: In view of the Court's order granting defendant Leena Doiron an extension of time until 1/2/2019 to answer, the Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 is RESET for 1/24/2019 at 10:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Deadline to file the Joint Status Report is reset to 1/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Leena Doiron's answer due 1/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) Modified on 12/20/2018 (JSL). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Leena Doiron. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Wilty, Reagan) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint for Damages by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Ulfers, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll Reagan R. Wilty as Co-Counsel For Leena Doiron. Added attorney Reagan Reynolds Wilty as co-counsel of record for defendant, Leena Doiron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Enroll Reagan R Wilty as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Enroll Reagan R Wilty as Additional Attorney by Leena Doiron. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Fagan, George) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Leena Doiron answer's due 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/28/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Leena Doiron. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Fagan, George) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company's answer due 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer With Consent. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer With Consent by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ulfers, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent to Removal by Leena Doiron. (EDC) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • (#6) Entered in error by case administrator on 11/27/2018. (SGO). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(b) by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Geary, Covert) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 674752. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1862153), filed by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Consent to Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Geary, Covert) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.