This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2019 at 07:15:00 (UTC).

Bath and Body Works Brand Management, Inc. v. Aldi Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Bath and Body Works Brand Management, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Aldi Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick F. Mumm and George H. Wu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-09738

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bath and Body Works Brand Management, Inc.

Defendant

Aldi Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bobby A Ghajar

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1333 2Nd Street Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401-4100

Marcus D Peterson

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1333 2Nd Street, Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Laura A Levine

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1333 2Nd Street Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

3 #1

Appendix Appendix A

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-9738 GW (FFMx). (esa) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Aldi Inc. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bath & Body Works Brand Management, Inc.. (Ghajar, Bobby) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bath & Body Works Brand Management, Inc., identifying L Brands Inc.. (Ghajar, Bobby) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Bath & Body Works Brand Management, Inc.. (Ghajar, Bobby) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Bath & Body Works Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A)(Ghajar, Bobby) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bath & Body Works Brand Management, Inc.. (Ghajar, Bobby) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22765534 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Bath & Body Works Brand Management, Inc.. (Attorney Bobby A Ghajar added to party Bath & Body Works Brand Management, Inc.(pty:pla))(Ghajar, Bobby) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BATH & BODY WORKS DIRECT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALDI (FLORIDA) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcus D Peterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bobby A. Ghajar