This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2022 at 09:29:17 (UTC).

Batalla Vidal, et al. v. Nielsen, et al.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2016 Batalla Vidal filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Nielsen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein, Vera M. Scanlon and Nicholas G. Garaufis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-04756

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judges

James Orenstein

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Batalla Vidal

Eliana Fernandez

Carolina Fung Feng

Defendants

Baran

Kathy A. Baran

Kelvin Medlock

Amicus Curiae

The Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County (LASSMC)

Service Employees International Union

African Services Committee

New York Legal Assistance Group (NYLAG)

Vassar College

Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI)

Alianza Americas

Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Asian Law Caucus

Barnard College

Asian American Bar Association of New York

United Farm Workers of America

City of Los Angeles

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Colgate University

Hispanic Federation, Inc.

130 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marisol Orihuela

Attorney at Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization

P.O. Box 209090

New Haven, CT 06520

Jessica Hanson

Attorney at National Immigration Law Center

3450 Wilshire Boulevard #108-62

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Justin B. Cox

Attorney at National Immigration Law Center

Pob 170208

Atlanta, GA 30317

Mayra B. Joachin

Attorney at ACLU of Southern California

1313 W. 8Th St.,, Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Muneer Ahmad

Attorney at Jerome N Frank Legal Services Organization

Po Box 209090

New Haven, CT 06520

Defendant Attorneys

Brad Rosenberg

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 883

Washington, DC 20044

Rachael Westmoreland

Attorney at DOJ-Civ

1100 L St, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Stephen M. Pezzi

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Kara Corinne Wilson

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 93404

Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Michael Dundas

Attorney at Los Angeles City Attorney

200 North Main Street, 7Th Floor, Los Angeles

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Other Attorneys

Seth D. Fiur

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Danielle Carim Gray

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Thomas Samuel Silverstein

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

1401 New York Ave Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20005

Shiloh Rainwater

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Michael Anthony Guerra

Attorney at Venable LLP

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10104

Andrew J. Pincus

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

1999 K Steet Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Alexia R Schapira

Make The Road Ny, 92-10 Roosevelt Ave

New York, NY 11372

Peter Karanjia

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

500 Eighth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Sameer Parvez Sheikh

2050 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20037

74 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

386 #2

Proposed Order

386 #1

Declaration

386 #386

Main Document

385 #8

Batalla Vidal Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Memorandum in Oppositi

385 #7

Exhibit B to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition

385 #6

Exhibit A to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition

385 #4

Memorandum in Support of Batalla Vidal Plaintiffs' Motion for Modification

385 #3

Exhibit A-C to Declaration of Muneer Ahmad

385 #385

Main Document

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

620 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #386 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marisol Orihuela terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/12/2022. (Lozar, Ryan) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#386) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Marisol Orihuela by Antonio Alarcon, Martin Jonathan Batalla Vidal, Carolina Fung Feng, Eliana Fernandez, Johana Larios Sainz, M.B.F., Make the Road New York, Sonia Molina, Carlos Vargas, Ximena Zamora. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Orihuela, Marisol) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Oral argument held on July 7, 2022. Counsel for the Plaintiffs and for Defendants present. Counsel for State Plaintiffs in related case, State of New York, et al. v. Biden et al., present. Counsel argued the pending #385 motion before the court. Decision is reserved. (Court Reporter Linda D. Danelczyk) (Nees, Ryan) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#385) Notice of MOTION to Alter Judgment (Motion for Modification) by Antonio Alarcon, Martin Jonathan Batalla Vidal, Carolina Fung Feng, Eliana Fernandez, Johana Larios Sainz, M.B.F., Make the Road New York, Sonia Molina, Carlos Vargas, Ximena Zamora. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Batalla Vidal Plaintiffs' Motion for Modification, #2 Declaration of Muneer Ahmad, #3 Exhibit A-C to Declaration of Muneer Ahmad, #4 Memorandum in Support of Batalla Vidal Plaintiffs' Motion for Modification by New York Plaintiffs, #5 Memorandum in Opposition to Batalla Vidal Plaintiffs' Motion for Modification, #6 Exhibit A to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition, #7 Exhibit B to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition, #8 Batalla Vidal Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition) (Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#384) ORDER re #383 proposed timeline should Plaintiffs file a fifth amended complaint. Defendants propose that their obligation to answer or otherwise respond to the fifth amended complaint be stayed until 21 days after the Court's order on Plaintiffs' motion to clarify. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/26/2022. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#383) Proposed Scheduling Order for Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' forthcoming fifth amended complaint by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Early, Cormac) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiffs' #382 Motion for Leave to File is GRANTED. Law students Aaron Bryce Lee, Daniel Ocampo, Aasha Shaik, and Kevin Cheng are authorized to appear under the supervision of attorneys Muneer I. Ahmad and Michael Wishnie. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/22/2022. (Nees, Ryan) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#382) MOTION for Leave to File Document Law Student Intern Appearances by Antonio Alarcon, Carolina Fung Feng, Eliana Fernandez, Johana Larios Sainz, M.B.F., Make the Road New York, Sonia Molina, Mariano Mondragon, Carlos Vargas, Ximena Zamora. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Law Student Intern Appearance Form for Aaron Bryce Lee, #2 Exhibit Law Student Intern Appearance Form for Daniel Ocampo, #3 Exhibit Law Student Intern Appearance Form for Aasha Shaik, #4 Exhibit Law Student Intern Appearance Form for Kevin Cheng, #5 Memorandum in Support of 1L Law Student Intern Appearance Form) (Ahmad, Muneer) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#381) ORDER, The parties have conferred and propose that the New York plaintiffs (17-cv-5228) file a submission regarding the Batalla Vidal plaintiffs' forthcoming motion by May 20, 2022. Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/11/2022. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Pre-motion conference held on April 4, 2022. Counsel for all parties present. The court granted leave for Plaintiffs to amend the complaint and set a briefing schedule for amending the complaint and/or moving to clarify as follows: Plaintiff's amendment and/or motion due by April 25, 2022; Defendants' opposition due by May 27, 2022; and Defendants' reply due by June 6, 2022. Defendants are DIRECTED to submit to the court a proposed timeline for which their obligation to answer an amended complaint, if any, would be stayed. The court granted the New York plaintiffs leave to submit a response to Plaintiffs' motion on a schedule to be proposed by the parties. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone) (Nees, Ryan) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
481 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER denying #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- The motion is denied without prejudice to renewal in conformity with this court's local rules, which require that an application for admission pro hac vice include a certificate from the state court of each state in which the applicant is a member of the bar confirming that the applicant is a member in good standing of the state court's bar. See Loc. Civ. R. 1.3(c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/30/2016. (Howley, Thomas) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karen C. Tumlin Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8875764. by Martin Jonathan Batalla Vidal. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Affidavit in Support) (Tumlin, Karen) (Entered: 08/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Kathy A. Baran, Susan M. Curda, Kelvin Medlock, Donald W. Neufeld. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 08/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. by Martin Jonathan Batalla Vidal (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wishnie on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Martin Jonathan Batalla Vidal (Taylor, Amy) (Entered: 08/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8866017 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Martin Jonathan Batalla Vidal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Taylor, Amy) (Entered: 08/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Baran is a litigant

Latest cases where Hispanic Federation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI) is a litigant

Latest cases where Barnard College is a litigant