This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2018 at 07:41:06 (UTC).

BASF Corp. v. Hychem, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 BASF Corp filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Hychem, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr, G. R. Smith, James E. Graham and R. Stan Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-MC-00013

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William T. Moore, Jr

R. Stan Baker

Referral Judges

G. R. Smith

James E. Graham

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BASF Corp.

Defendant

Hychem, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa M. Thomas

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Robert R. Riddle

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Sujey Scarlett Herrera

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

Lucas Drayton Bradley

Attorney at Bouhan Falligant, LLP

One West Park Avenue, P.O. Box 2139

Savannah, GA 31402-2139

Todd Michael Baiad

Attorney at Bouhan Falligant, LLP

One West Park Avenue, P.O. Box 2139

Savannah, GA 31402-2139

Defendant Attorneys

Aviva L. Wernick

Attorney at Hughes, Hubbard & Reed, LLP

Suite 2500, 201 S. Biscayne Blvd.

Miami, FL 33131

James Wilson Dabney

Attorney at Hughes, Hubbard & Reed, LLP

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

James D. Durham

Attorney at Savage & Turner, P.C.

P.O. Box 10600, 102 E. Liberty Street, 8Th Floor

Savannah, GA 31412

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Certificate of Related Cases 3.1 . (Riddle, Robert) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Drayton Bradley on behalf of BASF Corp. (Bradley, Lucas) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Baiad on behalf of BASF Corp. (Baiad, Todd) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

18 #4

Corrected Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice

18 #1

Exhibit Disclosure Pursuant to Local Rule 83.4

#18

(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James W. Dabney. Receipt Number 113J-2465334, Fee Amount $200, by Hychem, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disclosure Pursuant to Local Rule 83.4, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice for James W. Dabney)(Durham, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #4 Corrected Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (loh). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

17 #3

Corrected Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice

17 #2

Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice for Aviva Wernick

#17

(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aviva Wernick. Receipt Number 113J-2465321, Fee Amount $200, by Hychem, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice for Aviva Wernick)(Durham, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #3 Corrected Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (loh). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Certificate of Related Cases 3.1 . (Riddle, Robert) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Drayton Bradley on behalf of BASF Corp. (Bradley, Lucas) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Baiad on behalf of BASF Corp. (Baiad, Todd) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE; granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/17/18. (sff) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aviva Wernick, Receipt Number 113J-2465321, Fee Amount $200, #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James W. Dabney, Receipt Number 113J-2465334, Fee Amount $200. (loh) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James W. Dabney. Receipt Number 113J-2465334, Fee Amount $200, by Hychem, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disclosure Pursuant to Local Rule 83.4, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice for James W. Dabney)(Durham, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #4 Corrected Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (loh). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aviva Wernick. Receipt Number 113J-2465321, Fee Amount $200, by Hychem, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice for Aviva Wernick)(Durham, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #3 Corrected Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (loh). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Amendment to #15 Notice of Appearance of James D. Durham by Hychem, Inc. (Durham, James) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Durham on behalf of Hychem, Inc. (Durham, James) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham per order in case 4:18mc-16. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (jrb) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE to all counsel of record that a #1 Motion/complaint was transferred to the Southern District of Georgia. (wwp) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case transfer in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:18-mc-62103. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Transferring and Closing Case. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Plaintiffs Motion to Compel ECF No. #1 shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, for resolution, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f). The Clerk of Court for the Southern District of Florida is directed to promptly effectuate this transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by BASF, Corp. (Herrera, Sujey) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT in Support of Hychem's Opposition to BASF Corp.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Hychem, Inc. by Hychem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard M. Koehl, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Wernick, Aviva) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Hychem, Inc.. (Wernick, Aviva) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 9/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Referring Motion To Magistrate Judge; Referring #1 Motion to Compel Production of Documents to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow to be heard and determined consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of the Local Magistrate Judge Rules. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (jas) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District BASF Corp.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Hychem, Inc. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-10970580, filed by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Herrera, Sujey) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less