This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2019 at 07:16:49 (UTC).

United States of America v. United Excel Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2018 United States of America filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against United Excel Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy A. Leen and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02168

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy A. Leen

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bart' Electric Company, Inc.

United States of America

Defendants

United Excel Corporation

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rusty Graf

Attorney at Black & Lobello

10777 W. Twain Ave., Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) DECLARATION of Rusty Graf, Esq. re #12 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff United States of America. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

12 #2

Exhibit 2

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Proof of Service re: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued. United Excel Corporation served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

7 #4

Exhibit D

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) NOTICE In Response to The Court's Minute Order In Chambers Dated November 16, 2018, And In Further Support of Subject Matter Jurisdiction in This Action by United States of America re 6 Minute Order,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United States of America. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff United States of America. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5318104) by Bart' Electric Company, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Graf, Rusty) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/12/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DECLARATION of Rusty Graf, Esq. re #12 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff United States of America. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #9 Notice. The wrong event was selected. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #9 using the appropriate docket entry title, "Summons Returned Executed". (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Proof of Service re: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued. United Excel Corporation served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE In Response to The Court's Minute Order In Chambers Dated November 16, 2018, And In Further Support of Subject Matter Jurisdiction in This Action by United States of America re 6 Minute Order,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/16/2018. Plaintiff is HEREBY ORDERED to file a notice by November 30, 2018, clarifying the conflicting references regarding this Court's subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiff's claims made in paragraphs 4, 5, and 8 of the #1 Complaint. The notice shall also address whether supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state-based claims is proper.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ME) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United States of America. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff United States of America. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff United States of America. (Graf, Rusty) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (ADR) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5318104) by Bart' Electric Company, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Graf, Rusty) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rusty Graf