This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/29/2019 at 09:29:46 (UTC).

Barry Bauer, et al v. Xavier Becerra, et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2015 Barry Bauer, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Xavier Becerra,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-15428

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Amicus Curiae

BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE

LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE

Plaintiff / Appellants

BARRY BAUER

CALIFORNIA RIFLE AND PISTOL ASSOCIATION FOUNDATION

JEFFREY HACKER

NICOLE FERRY

NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.

HERB BAUER SPORTING GOODS, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

DOES, 1-10

STEPHEN LINDLEY, in his official capacity as Acting Chief of the California Department of Justice

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California

KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Sarah E. Tremont

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

850 Tenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Jordan Eth

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Sean Anthony Brady

Attorney at Michel & Associates, P.C.

180 E. Ocean Blvd.

Long Beach, CA 90802

Anna Barvir

Attorney at Michel & Associates, P.C.

180 E. Ocean Blvd.

Long Beach, CA 90802

Edmund G. LaCour Jr.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Carl D. Michel Esquire

Attorney at Michel & Associates, P.C.

180 E. Ocean Blvd.

Long Beach, CA 90802

Erin E. Murphy

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Paul D. Clement

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Anthony R. Hakl

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#59

#58

#57

#56

#55

#54

53 #2

Post Judgment Form

53 #1

Opinion

#51

#7

6 #2

Excerpts Vol. 2

6 #1

Excerpts Vol. 1

#3

#2

1 #4

Docketing Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Questionnaire

#1

Mediation Letter

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 17-719 Filed on: 11/09/2017 Cert Petition Action 1: Denied, 02/20/2018 [10771551] (RR) [Entered: 02/21/2018 12:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 17-719 Filed on: 11/09/2017 Cert Petition Action 1: Pending [10659853] (RR) [Entered: 11/19/2017 01:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 17-719 Filed on: 11/09/2017 Cert Petition Action 1: Pending [10659853] (RR) [Entered: 11/19/2017 01:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Received letter from the Supreme Court dated 09/21/2017 regarding the application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kennedy, who on September 21, 2017, extended the time to and including November 9, 2017. Application No. 17A318. [10598890] (RR) [Entered: 09/28/2017 04:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MANDATE ISSUED.(SRT, FFF and MHM) [10515667] (Walker, Synitha) [Entered: 07/20/2017 11:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ and MARY H. MURGUIA): The panel has voted to deny Appellants petition for rehearing en banc. The full Court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc, and no judge has requested a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35(b). The appellants petition for rehearing en banc is denied. [10505613] (AF) [Entered: 07/12/2017 11:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Filed (ECF) Appellants Barry Bauer, California Rifle and Pistol Association Foundation, Nicole Ferry, Jeffrey Hacker, Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc. and NRA petition for rehearing en banc (from 06/01/2017 opinion). Date of service: 06/15/2017. [10474426] [15-15428] (Clement, Paul) [Entered: 06/15/2017 08:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) FILED OPINION (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ and MARY H. MURGUIA) AFFIRMED. Judge: SRT Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [10455263] (RMM) [Entered: 06/01/2017 07:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [10402980] (TG) [Entered: 04/19/2017 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Docket(#52) ENTRY UPDATED. ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO Judges SIDNEY R. THOMAS, FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ and MARY H. MURGUIA. [10409504]--[Edited 04/25/2017 by AT] (AT) [Entered: 04/25/2017 09:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Errata to Opening brief ([ # 7 ] Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing)). Filed by Appellants Barry Bauer, California Rifle and Pistol Association Foundation, Nicole Ferry, Jeffrey Hacker, Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc. and NRA. Date of service: 07/20/2015. [9616257] [15-15428]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected notice and errata. 07/21/2015 by RY] (CDM) [Entered: 07/20/2015 04:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 7 ] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 6 ] submitted by appellants. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9614128] (KT) [Entered: 07/17/2015 02:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 6 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Barry Bauer, California Rifle and Pistol Association Foundation, Nicole Ferry, Jeffrey Hacker, Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc. and NRA. Date of service: 07/15/2015. [9611874] [15-15428] (CDM) [Entered: 07/15/2015 11:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Barry Bauer, California Rifle and Pistol Association Foundation, Nicole Ferry, Jeffrey Hacker, Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc. and NRA. Date of service: 07/15/2015. [9611873] [15-15428]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 07/17/2015 by RY] (CDM) [Entered: 07/15/2015 11:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Barry Bauer, California Rifle and Pistol Association Foundation, Nicole Ferry, Jeffrey Hacker, Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc. and NRA. Date of service: 07/15/2015. [9611867] [15-15428]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts in 3 volumes. 07/17/2015 by RY]--[Edited: attached corrected brief and excerpts (3 volumes) 07/17/2015 by RY]--[Edited: Removed brief (attached in error). See correct entry [ # 7 ]. 07/17/2015 by RY] (CDM) [Entered: 07/15/2015 10:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Docket(#5) Streamlined request [4] by Appellants Barry Bauer, California Rifle and Pistol Association Foundation, Nicole Ferry, Jeffrey Hacker, Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc. and NRA to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Barry Bauer, California Rifle and Pistol Association Foundation, Nicole Ferry, Jeffrey Hacker, Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc. and National Rifle Association of America, Inc. opening brief due 07/15/2015. Appellees Does, Kamala D. Harris, Attorney General and Stephen Lindley answering brief due 08/14/2015. The optional reply brief is due 14 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [9502409] (SB) [Entered: 04/21/2015 08:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Barry Bauer, California Rifle and Pistol Association Foundation, Nicole Ferry, Jeffrey Hacker, Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc. and NRA. New requested due date is 07/15/2015. [9502208] [15-15428] (CDM) [Entered: 04/20/2015 05:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Mediation order: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [9477218] (VS) [Entered: 03/30/2015 02:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Barry Bauer, Nicole Ferry, Jeffrey Hacker, Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc., NRA and California Rifle and Pistol Association Foundation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/16/2015. [9459359] [15-15428] (CDM) [Entered: 03/16/2015 04:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/16/2015. Transcript ordered by 04/06/2015. Transcript due 05/05/2015. Appellants Barry Bauer, California Rifle and Pistol Association Foundation, Nicole Ferry, Jeffrey Hacker, Herb Bauer Sporting Goods, Inc. and National Rifle Association of America, Inc. opening brief due 06/15/2015. Appellees Does, Kamala D. Harris, Attorney General and Stephen Lindley answering brief due 07/15/2015. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9450294] (RT) [Entered: 03/09/2015 03:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE is a litigant

Latest cases where California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE is a litigant

Latest cases where National Rifle Association is a litigant