This case was last updated from PACER on 01/28/2019 at 07:40:11 (UTC).

Barrett v. Taylor et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 Barrett filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Taylor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert E. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00825

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darby J. Barrett

Defendants

Adrian S. Taylor

CT Transportation, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Rush Rand

Attorney at Blackburn Conte Schilling & Click PC

300 W Main St

Richmond, VA 23220

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Patrick Frankl

Attorney at Frankl Miller Webb & Moyers LLP

1711 Grandin Rd, Po Box 4126

Roanoke, VA 24015

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MOTION to Bifurcate by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on June 26, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of United States Magistrate Judge David J. Novak (please see Order for additional information.) It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 01/24/2019. (walk, ) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER that the Demurrer filed in the state court (ECF No. #1 -4 (DEMURRER AND ANSWER OF ADRIAN S. TAYLOR AND CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC)) is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion on the same topic pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 with accompanying briefs. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/17/2019. (smej, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER that the settlement conference and proceedings required by paragraph 3 of the Scheduling Order are referred to United States Magistrate Judge David J. Novak. Counsel shall be responsible for contacting the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Novak within five (5) days of the date of this Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/16/2019. (smej, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER that the Motion for Consolidation and a separate Motion for Bifurcation shall be filed and briefed on the following schedule. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/16/2019. (smej, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#8

(#8) JURY INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER. At a pretrial conference held on January 16, 2019, this action was set for trial by a jury on September 10, 2019, at 9:30 o'clock, a.m. The Scheduling Order and Pretrial Schedule A previously issued in this action shall remain in effect. A Final Pretrial Conference will be conducted at 10:00 o'clock, a.m. on September 4, 2019, at which time trial counsel shall present for entry a Final Pretrial Order setting forth: (See for complete details). It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/16/2019. (nbrow) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#7

(#7) Decline Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#6

(#6) Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Darby J. Barrett. (Rand, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDERED that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether both parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES AND DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/02/2019. (smej, ) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

4 #1

Schedule A

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/28/2018. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. See for complete details. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 10:45 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/28/2018. (nbrow) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

1 #4

State Court Answer

1 #3

State Court Complaint

1 #2

Appendix Financial Interest Disclosure Statement

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 0422-6384226), filed by CT Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Financial Interest Disclosure Statement)(Frankl, Daniel) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/29/2018) (smej, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2018: #3 State Court Complaint, #4 State Court Answer) (smej, ). Modified to correct docket on 11/29/2018 (smej, ). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Bifurcate by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Settlement Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge David J. Novak. (cgar) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on June 26, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of United States Magistrate Judge David J. Novak (please see Order for additional information.) It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 01/24/2019. (walk, ) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER that the Demurrer filed in the state court (ECF No. #1 -4 (DEMURRER AND ANSWER OF ADRIAN S. TAYLOR AND CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC)) is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion on the same topic pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 with accompanying briefs. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/17/2019. (smej, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Case Referred to Magistrate Judge David J. Novak for Settlement purposes. (smej, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER that the settlement conference and proceedings required by paragraph 3 of the Scheduling Order are referred to United States Magistrate Judge David J. Novak. Counsel shall be responsible for contacting the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Novak within five (5) days of the date of this Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/16/2019. (smej, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER that the Motion for Consolidation and a separate Motion for Bifurcation shall be filed and briefed on the following schedule. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/16/2019. (smej, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) JURY INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER. At a pretrial conference held on January 16, 2019, this action was set for trial by a jury on September 10, 2019, at 9:30 o'clock, a.m. The Scheduling Order and Pretrial Schedule A previously issued in this action shall remain in effect. A Final Pretrial Conference will be conducted at 10:00 o'clock, a.m. on September 4, 2019, at which time trial counsel shall present for entry a Final Pretrial Order setting forth: (See for complete details). It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/16/2019. (nbrow) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/16/2019. (nbrow) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Decline Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Darby J. Barrett. (Rand, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDERED that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether both parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES AND DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/02/2019. (smej, ) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/28/2018. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. See for complete details. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 10:45 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/28/2018. (nbrow) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (smej, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal: Clerk notified filing attorney of proper filing procedures for opening civil cases. Clerk has modified the docket. (smej, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CT Transportation, LLC. (smej, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 0422-6384226), filed by CT Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Financial Interest Disclosure Statement)(Frankl, Daniel) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/29/2018) (smej, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2018: #3 State Court Complaint, #4 State Court Answer) (smej, ). Modified to correct docket on 11/29/2018 (smej, ). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CT Transportation LLC is a litigant