This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2018 at 07:32:32 (UTC).

Baro v. TransUnion, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 Baro filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against TransUnion, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01473

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cecilia M. Baro

Defendants

TransUnion, LLC

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David H. Krieger

Attorney at Haines & Krieger, LLC

8985 S. Eastern Avenue, Suite 350

Henderson, NV 89123

Shawn Wayne Miller

Attorney at Haines & Krieger, LLC

8985 S. Eastern Avenue, Suite 350

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Defendant Attorney

Jason Revzin

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89118

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. Responses due by 10/5/2018. (Revzin, Jason) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. re #8 Amended Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #11 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/20/2019. Motions due by 4/19/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Time. TransUnion, LLC answer due 9/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#8

(#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against TransUnion, LLC by Cecilia M. Baro. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 12/31/2018.(Krieger, David) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cecilia M. Baro. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TransUnion, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate Trans Union LLC, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC added. (Revzin, Jason) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#5

(#5) FIRST STIPULATION for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Revzin, Jason) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5188659) by Cecilia M. Baro. Proof of service due by 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons TransUnion)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to SPS by Plaintiff Cecilia M. Baro. (Krieger, David) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

1 #2

Summons TransUnion

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to TransUnion, LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#11

(#11) PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Cecilia M. Baro (Miller, Shawn) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • (#13) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (ADR) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #11 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/20/2019. Motions due by 4/19/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Cecilia M. Baro (Miller, Shawn) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. re #8 Amended Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to SPS by Plaintiff Cecilia M. Baro. (Krieger, David) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against TransUnion, LLC by Cecilia M. Baro. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 12/31/2018.(Krieger, David) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. Responses due by 10/5/2018. (Revzin, Jason) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Time. TransUnion, LLC answer due 9/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FIRST STIPULATION for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Revzin, Jason) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TransUnion, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate Trans Union LLC, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC added. (Revzin, Jason) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to TransUnion, LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cecilia M. Baro. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5188659) by Cecilia M. Baro. Proof of service due by 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons TransUnion)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.