This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/18/2021 at 19:49:42 (UTC).

BARNES v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 BARNES filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Magnus-Stinson and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-02874

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY A. BARNES

Defendants

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

FORUM CREDIT UNION

FIFTH THIRD BANK

5050 Kingsley Dr, Md# 1Mocfp

Cincinnatti, OH 45263

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC

STAR FINANCIAL BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Travis W. Cohron

Attorney at BARKER HANCOCK COHRON, LLP

198 South 9Th Street

Noblesville, IN 46060

Defendant Attorneys

Kyle W LeClere

Attorney at BARNES THORNBURG LLP.

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Logan C. Hughes

Attorney at REMINGER CO. LPA (Indianapolis)

8909 Purdue Road, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46268

Patrick J. Ruberry

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

303 W. Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Phillip Glen Litchfield

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

303 W. Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Misty L. Peterson

Attorney at KING & SPAULDING LLP

1180 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

James E. Rossow, Jr.

Attorney at RUBIN & LEVIN, P.C.

135 North Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Plaintiff, Kimberly A. Barnes, by counsel has moved this court to dismiss this cause of action. The Court now GRANTS said Motion. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. This matter is now concluded in its entirety. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/8/2018.(APD) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

58 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#58

(#58) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

#57

(#57) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Granting #56 Motion to Dismiss Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC only are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/20/2017.(APD) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

56 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#56

(#56) STIPULATION of Dismissal re Equifax Information Services, LLC only, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

#55

(#55) ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT FORUM CREDIT UNION - Granting #53 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Forum Credit Union only are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/6/2017. (APD) (Entered: 12/06/2017)

53 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#53

(#53) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Forum Credit Union, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

1 #10

Proposed Summons Summons to Defendants

1 #8

Exhibit H- Experian Report

1 #7

Exhibit G- Dispute Letter

1 #6

Exhibit F- Equifax Report

1 #5

Exhibit E- Dispute Letter

1 #4

Exhibit D- Discharge Order

1 #3

Exhibit C- Schedule D

1 #2

Exhibit B- Schedule D

1 #1

Exhibit A- Schedule F

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Plaintiff, Kimberly A. Barnes, by counsel has moved this court to dismiss this cause of action. The Court now GRANTS said Motion. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. This matter is now concluded in its entirety. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/8/2018.(APD) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Granting #56 Motion to Dismiss Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC only are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/20/2017.(APD) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) STIPULATION of Dismissal re Equifax Information Services, LLC only, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT FORUM CREDIT UNION - Granting #53 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Forum Credit Union only are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/6/2017. (APD) (Entered: 12/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF DOCUMENTS AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL: Plaintiff has filed #53 Motion to Dismiss remaining Defendant Forum Credit Union. Therefore, all previously ordered dates are hereby VACATED, including the telephonic Status Conference set for 12/5/2017 at 11:00 A.M. (Eastern). *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/5/2017. (GD) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Forum Credit Union, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA terminated. Plaintiff, Kimberly A. Barnes, by counsel has moved this court to dismiss all claims against Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A. ("Chase") (incorrectly named herein as "JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA") ONLY from this cause. The Court grants this motion. All of Plaintiff's claims against Chase, and ONLY Chase, are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. The Clerk is instructed to terminate Chase Bank USA, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA as parties from this matter. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/13/2017.(APD) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) STIPULATION of Dismissal re JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA only, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF DOCUMENTS AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action ONLY as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Therefore, all pending motions with regard to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED only to the extent they relate to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Within sixty (60) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause ONLY as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/6/2017.(SWM) (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent EXPERIAN PLC, Other Affiliate CENTRAL SOURCE LLC, Other Affiliate ONLINE DATA EXCHANGE LLC, Other Affiliate NEW MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate VANTAGESCORE SOLUTIONS LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC... (Hughes, Logan) (Entered: 09/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Logan C. Hughes on behalf of Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Hughes, Logan) (Entered: 09/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Exhibit List , filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES, Witness List , filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (APD) (Entered: 08/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NAD) (Entered: 08/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., FIFTH THIRD BANK, FORUM CREDIT UNION, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA, STAR FINANCIAL BANK. (NAD) (Entered: 08/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by KIMBERLY A. BARNES. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 8/22/2017. (Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 08/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis W. Cohron on behalf of Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demand against All Defendants, filed by KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4501948) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Schedule F, #2 Exhibit B- Schedule D, #3 Exhibit C- Schedule D, #4 Exhibit D- Discharge Order, #5 Exhibit E- Dispute Letter, #6 Exhibit F- Equifax Report, #7 Exhibit G- Dispute Letter, #8 Exhibit H- Experian Report, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons Summons to Defendants)(Cohron, Travis) (Entered: 08/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less