This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:03:03 (UTC).

Barnes v. Bechtel Oil Gas & Chemicals

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Barnes filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bechtel Oil Gas Chemicals. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00798

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wayne Andre' Barnes

Donaldsonville, LA 70346

Defendant

Bechtel Oil Gas & Chemicals

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is responsible for submitting the summons and the Clerk is directed to issue process. The USM shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendant(s) wherever found. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/25/2018. Order to be sent to USM when summons submitted to Clerk of Court. (LLH) Modified on 9/26/2018 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wayne Andre Barnes. (EDC) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #2

envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bechtel Oil Gas & Chemicals, filed by Wayne Andre Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(EDC) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2018 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 11/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/26/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2018 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 11/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/26/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is responsible for submitting the summons and the Clerk is directed to issue process. The USM shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendant(s) wherever found. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/25/2018. Order to be sent to USM when summons submitted to Clerk of Court. (LLH) Modified on 9/26/2018 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wayne Andre Barnes. (EDC) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Bechtel Oil Gas & Chemicals, filed by Wayne Andre Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(EDC) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.