This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2018 at 08:07:28 (UTC).

Banwart et al v. Cedar Falls Community School District et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 Banwart filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Cedar Falls Community School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-02074

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christy Banwart

Lance Banwart

Defendants

Cedar Falls Community School District

Area Education Agency 267

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon M Schwartz

Attorney at Schwartz Law Firm

600 Inwood Ave N #130, **Ecf

Oakdale, MN 55128

Defendant Attorney

Dustin Troy Zeschke

Attorney at Swisher & Cohrt PLC

528 West 4Th Street, Po 1200, ***Ecf

Waterloo, IA 50704

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Proof of Service by Christy Banwart. Cedar Falls Community School District served on 10/3/2018. (Schwartz, Brandon) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (mmc). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#6

(#6) Proof of Service by Christy Banwart. Area Education Agency 267 served on 10/3/2018. (Schwartz, Brandon) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (mmc). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Area Education Agency 267, Cedar Falls Community School District.(Zeschke, Dustin) Modified on 10/24/2018 to edit text. (src) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Troy Zeschke on behalf of All Defendants. (Zeschke, Dustin) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

3 #1

Civil Actions new case packet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Area Education Agency 267, Cedar Falls Community School District. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/1/2018. (des) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit D to Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit C to Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B to Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A to Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2785348.), filed by Christy Banwart, Lance Banwart. Scheduling Report due by 12/31/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Complaint) (Schwartz, Brandon) Modified text on 10/2/2018 to remove duplicate text from names of Attachments. Main Document 1, Attachment 2, Attachment 3, Attachment 4 and Attachment 5 replaced on 10/2/2018 pursuant to MAR chambers and LR 10(g) (des) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proof of Service by Christy Banwart. Cedar Falls Community School District served on 10/3/2018. (Schwartz, Brandon) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (mmc). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proof of Service by Christy Banwart. Area Education Agency 267 served on 10/3/2018. (Schwartz, Brandon) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (mmc). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Area Education Agency 267, Cedar Falls Community School District.(Zeschke, Dustin) Modified on 10/24/2018 to edit text. (src) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Troy Zeschke on behalf of All Defendants. (Zeschke, Dustin) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Area Education Agency 267, Cedar Falls Community School District. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/1/2018. (des) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2785348.), filed by Christy Banwart, Lance Banwart. Scheduling Report due by 12/31/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Complaint) (Schwartz, Brandon) Modified text on 10/2/2018 to remove duplicate text from names of Attachments. Main Document 1, Attachment 2, Attachment 3, Attachment 4 and Attachment 5 replaced on 10/2/2018 pursuant to MAR chambers and LR 10(g) (des) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less