This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2019 at 07:33:17 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. v. Forest et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Bank of America, N A filed an Other lawsuit against Forest. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph N. Laplante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01153

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph N. Laplante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A.

275 W. Natick Road, Suite 50D

Warwick, RI 02886

Defendants

Marc and Deborah Forest

US Department of Housing and Urban Development

US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary

Deborah Forest

Weare, NH 03281

Marc R. Forest

Weare, NH 03281

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marina Plummer

Attorney at Marinosci Law Group PC

275 West Natick Rd, Ste 500

Warwick, RI 02886

Defendant Attorney

Michael T. McCormack

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION to Stay Due to Lapse in Appropriations filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary. Follow up on Objection on 1/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit as to Attorney's fees

#4

(#4) OBJECTION to #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Follow up on Reply on 1/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit as to Attorney's fees)(Plummer, Marina) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

3 #3

Exhibit B-Certificate of Indebtedness

3 #2

Exhibit A-Mortgage

3 #1

Memorandum of Law

#3

(#3) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary. Follow up on Objection on 1/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A-Mortgage, #3 Exhibit B-Certificate of Indebtedness)(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

2 #1

State Court Record

#2

(#2) Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2018-cv-01155, Rockingham County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Filing Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A- State Court Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2018-CV-01155 (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development. Answer Follow Up on 1/2/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER mooting #5 Motion to Stay Due to Lapse in Appropriations. Text of Order: Moot. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Stay Due to Lapse in Appropriations filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary. Follow up on Objection on 1/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) OBJECTION to #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Follow up on Reply on 1/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit as to Attorney's fees)(Plummer, Marina) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary. Follow up on Objection on 1/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A-Mortgage, #3 Exhibit B-Certificate of Indebtedness)(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2018-cv-01155, Rockingham County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(bt) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1153-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt) Modified on 12/17/2018 to change judge designation from LM to JL (jb). (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2018-CV-01155 (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development. Answer Follow Up on 1/2/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormack, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less