This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2019 at 08:15:00 (UTC).

Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa v. Small

Case Summary

On 12/06/2018 Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc Cooperativa filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Small. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-11399

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa

Defendant

Esq. Charles H. Small

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew M Moskowitz

Attorney at Javerbaum Wurgaft Hicks Kahn Wilkstrom & Sinins

505 Morris Avenue

Springfield, NJ 07081

 

Court Documents

6 #10

Exhibit 3-4

6 #9

Exhibit 2I-2K

6 #7

Exhibit 2G

6 #6

Exhibit 2F

6 #5

Exhibit 2C-2E

6 #4

Exhibit 2B

6 #3

Exhibit 2A

6 #2

Exhibit 2

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Charles H. Small.Document filed by Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 2C-2E, #6 Exhibit 2F, #7 Exhibit 2G, #8 Exhibit 2H, #9 Exhibit 2I-2K, #10 Exhibit 3-4, #11 Declaration of Service)(Moskowitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Charles H. Small.Document filed by Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 2C-2E, #6 Exhibit 2F, #7 Exhibit 2G, #8 Exhibit 2H, #9 Exhibit 2I-2K, #10 Exhibit 3-4, #11 Declaration of Service)(Moskowitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Charles H. Small served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. Service was accepted by Charles H. Small, Esq.. Document filed by Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa. (Moskowitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles H. Small. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew M Moskowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,500,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrew M Moskowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa, Charles H. Small. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Charles H. Small, Esq., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa. (Moskowitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Moskowitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Charles H. Small. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16012536)Document filed by Banca Di Credito Cooperativo di Civitanova Marche e Montecosaro Soc. Cooperativa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Moskowitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less