This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2018 at 20:31:14 (UTC).

Banc of California, Inc. et al v. Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2016 Banc of California, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:16-CV-01601

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Banc of California, Inc

Banc of California, Inc.

Banc of California, N.A.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach

DOES 1 through 10

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

Banc of California, Inc.

Banc of California, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Lawrence Aronoff

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Avenue 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1543

Diana Hughes Leiden

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gayle I Jenkins

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Avenue 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1543

Laura M Franco

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-5802

Saul S Rostamian

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David M Cohen

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Lauren K Katzenellenbogen

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Michael K Friedland

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Justin James Gillett

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson and Bear LLP

2040 Main Street 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#211

RESTRICTED

#210

RESTRICTED

#209

RESTRICTED

#207

RESTRICTED

#200

(#202) SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Adam Michaelson in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) re Declaration (Motion related),, #165 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #200 filed by Defendant Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24 (Part 1), #2 Exhibit 24 (Part 2))(Katzenellenbogen, Lauren) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

180 #1

Statement of Genuine Disputes (Redacted Version)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/31/2016)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 08/31/2016)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, National Association. (Rostamian, Saul) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, National Association, (Rostamian, Saul) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

#3

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 08/31/2016)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, National Association. (Rostamian, Saul) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach. (dv) (Entered: 09/01/2016)

528 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#211) SEALED DOCUMENT Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Gayle I. Jenkins In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #190 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #200 filed by Plaintiffs Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, N.A..(Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#210) SEALED DOCUMENT Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Facts re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #190 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #200 filed by Plaintiffs Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, N.A..(Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#209) SEALED DOCUMENT Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Trademark Distinctiveness re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #190 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #200 filed by Plaintiffs Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, N.A..(Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#208) SEALED DOCUMENT Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 6-7, 8, 10 and 21-24 to the Declaration of Gayle I Jenkins in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #172 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #200 filed by Plaintiffs Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6-7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 10-Part 1, #4 Exhibit 10-Part 2, #5 Exhibit 10-Part 3, #6 Exhibit 21-24)(Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#207) SEALED DOCUMENT (Statement of Genuine Disputes in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment) re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #180 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #200 filed by Defendant Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach.(Katzenellenbogen, Lauren) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#206) SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibits 1-3 to Declaration of Adam Michaelson in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment) re Declaration (Motion related), #185 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #200 filed by Defendant Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach.(Katzenellenbogen, Lauren) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#205) SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Merilee Langdon in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment) re Declaration (Motion related), #184 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #200 filed by Defendant Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach.(Katzenellenbogen, Lauren) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#204) SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit A to Declaration of Lauren Katzenellenbogen in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment) re Declaration (Motion related), #186 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #200 filed by Defendant Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach.(Katzenellenbogen, Lauren) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#203) SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibits 49-56 to Declaration of Lauren Katzenellenbogen in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) re Declaration (Motion related),,, #168 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #200 filed by Defendant Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 49-54, #2 Exhibit 55 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit 55 (Part 2), #4 Exhibit 55 (Part 3), #5 Exhibit 55 (Part 4), #6 Exhibit 55 (Part 5), #7 Exhibit 56)(Katzenellenbogen, Lauren) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#202) SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Adam Michaelson in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) re Declaration (Motion related),, #165 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, #200 filed by Defendant Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24 (Part 1), #2 Exhibit 24 (Part 2))(Katzenellenbogen, Lauren) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
192 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach. (dv) (Entered: 09/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, N.A.. (Rostamian, Saul) (Entered: 08/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 08/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 08/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, National Association. (Rostamian, Saul) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, National Association, (Rostamian, Saul) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, National Association. (Rostamian, Saul) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, National Association. (Rostamian, Saul) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18468175 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Banc of California, Inc., Banc of California, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Saul S Rostamian added to party Banc of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Saul S Rostamian added to party Banc of California, National Association(pty:pla))(Rostamian, Saul) (Entered: 08/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach is a litigant

Latest cases where Banc of California, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura M Franco

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saul S Rostamian