Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:40:13 (UTC).

Ball v. Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 Ball filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael E. Hegarty and Marcia S. Krieger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02535

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

Presiding Judge

Marcia S. Krieger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffanie A. Ball

Defendants

Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC

Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC doing business as Enterprise Rent A Car

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eudoxie Dickey

Attorney at Civil Rights & Employment Law Advocates, LLC

2300 Walnut Street, Suite 123

Denver, CO 80205

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy Ben Merkelson

Attorney at Holland & Hart, LLP-DC

975 F Street, N.W., Suite 900

Washington, DC 20004

Brian Michael Mumaugh

Attorney at Holland & Hart, LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3200

Denver, CO 80202

Katarina L. Harris

Attorney at Holland & Hart, LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3200

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference and Extend Related Deadlines. Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018 is vacated and reset to 1/10/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/26/2018. (mdave, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#20

(#20) Joint MOTION to Vacate #4 Minute Order AND RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND EXTEND RELATED DEADLINES by Defendant Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC. (Harris, Katarina) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/14/2018. ORDERED that the judge's file be returned to the clerk's office for the case to be reassigned by random draw. (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katarina L. Harris on behalf of Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLCAttorney Katarina L. Harris added to party Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC(pty:dft) (Harris, Katarina) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#12

(#13) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02535-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Michael Mumaugh on behalf of Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLCAttorney Brian Michael Mumaugh added to party Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC(pty:dft) (Mumaugh, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER re: #7 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Tiffanie A. Ball by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/9/2018. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#7

(#9) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-2535-WYD. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eudoxie Dickey on behalf of Tiffanie A. Ball (Dickey, Eudoxie) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tiffanie A. Ball. Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC waiver sent on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Dickey, Eudoxie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#4

(#20) Joint MOTION to Vacate #4 Minute Order AND RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND EXTEND RELATED DEADLINES by Defendant Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC. (Harris, Katarina) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rsams, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6326496)Attorney Eudoxie Dickey added to party Tiffanie A. Ball(pty:pla), filed by Tiffanie A. Ball.(Dickey, Eudoxie) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference and Extend Related Deadlines. Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018 is vacated and reset to 1/10/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/26/2018. (mdave, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MEMORANDUM regarding #20 Joint MOTION to Vacate #4 Minute Order AND RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND EXTEND RELATED DEADLINES filed by Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/24/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Joint MOTION to Vacate #4 Minute Order AND RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND EXTEND RELATED DEADLINES by Defendant Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC. (Harris, Katarina) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • (#19) ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/16/18. Text Only Entry (pglov) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • (#18) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/14/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • (#17) CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore this case has been randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02535-MSK. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02535-REB-MEH. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/14/2018. ORDERED that the judge's file be returned to the clerk's office for the case to be reassigned by random draw. (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katarina L. Harris on behalf of Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLCAttorney Katarina L. Harris added to party Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC(pty:dft) (Harris, Katarina) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02535-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Michael Mumaugh on behalf of Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLCAttorney Brian Michael Mumaugh added to party Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC(pty:dft) (Mumaugh, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-2535-WYD. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER re: #7 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Tiffanie A. Ball by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/9/2018. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Tiffanie A. Ball All parties do not consent.. (Dickey, Eudoxie) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eudoxie Dickey on behalf of Tiffanie A. Ball (Dickey, Eudoxie) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tiffanie A. Ball. Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC waiver sent on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Dickey, Eudoxie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/04/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rsams, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Enterprise Leasing Company of Denver, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6326496)Attorney Eudoxie Dickey added to party Tiffanie A. Ball(pty:pla), filed by Tiffanie A. Ball.(Dickey, Eudoxie) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC is a litigant