This case was last updated from PACER on 01/23/2018 at 05:37:08 (UTC).

Bainum et al v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2018 Bainum filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. K. Holmes, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-06010

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Timothy Bainum

Mary Lynda Robbins

Defendants and Counter Claimants

The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Agency Services of Arkansas, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

L.D. Simmons

201 North Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

George J. Bequette, Jr.

Attorney at Bequette and Billingsley P.A.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 3200

Little Rock, AR 72201

Lowndes Quinlan

201 Noerth Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jason Allen Walters

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cumings

1819 5Th Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Blake B. Goodsell

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Graham R. Pulvere

Attorney at Lloyd Gray Whitehead & Monroe PC

880 Montclair Road, Suite 100

Birmingham, AL 35213

Stephen E. Whitehead

Attorney at Lloyd Gray Whitehead & Monroe PC

880 Montclair Road, Suite100

Birmingham, AL 35213

Travis Ray Berry

Attorney at Wright Berry Hughes and Moore

P.O. Drawer 947, 303 Professional Park Drive

Arkadelphia, AR 71923

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

1 #6

Exhibit 6 Letter

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against Agency Services of Arkansas, Inc., The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, filed by Timothy Bainum, Mary Lynda Robbins. Filed in the Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas, 8/11/2017.(lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Policy

#9

(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2018. Bench Trial set for 1/22/2019 at 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 22, 2018. (jas) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas, case number 55CV-17-60-1. ( Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 2020127), filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 Plaintiffs Discovery Responses, #4 Exhibit 4 Affidavit of Luke Ramsey, #5 Exhibit 5 Plaintiffs Document Production, #6 Exhibit 6 Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 Consent to Removal)(lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

#6

(#6) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Timothy Bainum, Mary Lynda Robbins by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.Filed in the Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas, 10/10/2017.(lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit 4 Affidavit of Luke Ramsey

1 #7

Exhibit 7 Consent to Removal

1 #5

Exhibit 5 Plaintiffs Document Production

1 #1

Exhibit 1 State Court Pleadings

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Lincoln National Corporation. (lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

#8

(#8) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to parties. (lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 Plaintiffs Discovery Responses

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #4 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Timothy Bainum, Mary Lynda Robbins by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(lw)Filed in the Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas, 9/20/2017. Modified on 1/22/2018 to add txt(lw). (Entered: 01/22/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Agency Services of Arkansas, Inc.Filed in the Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas, 10/16/2017.(lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2018. Bench Trial set for 1/22/2019 at 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 22, 2018. (jas) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to parties. (lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Agency Services of Arkansas, Inc.Filed in the Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas, 10/16/2017.(lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Timothy Bainum, Mary Lynda Robbins by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.Filed in the Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas, 10/10/2017.(lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #4 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Timothy Bainum, Mary Lynda Robbins by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(lw)Filed in the Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas, 9/20/2017. Modified on 1/22/2018 to add txt(lw). (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Agency Services of Arkansas, Inc., The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, filed by Timothy Bainum, Mary Lynda Robbins. Filed in the Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas, 8/11/2017.(lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to Counsel in Removal Cases: The following attorneys listed on pleadings are not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas: L.D. Simmons, Lowndes Quinlan, Graham R. Pulvere,Stephen E. Whitehead. An attorney can register for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to Local Rule 83.5 and General Order 36 for further information. (lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Lincoln National Corporation. (lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas, case number 55CV-17-60-1. ( Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 2020127), filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 Plaintiffs Discovery Responses, #4 Exhibit 4 Affidavit of Luke Ramsey, #5 Exhibit 5 Plaintiffs Document Production, #6 Exhibit 6 Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 Consent to Removal)(lw) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.